California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:18-mj-05429
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2018
Terminated:Oct 19, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Nov 17, 2018 11:13 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Apple iPhone Model A1660 FCC ID BCG-E3085A IC 579C-E3085A IMEI 355827087278013 (1)
Terminated: 10/19/2018


Docket last updated: 11/17/2018 11:45 PM PST
Friday, October 19, 2018
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Apple iPhone Model A1660 FCC ID BCG-E3085A IC 579C-E3085A IMEI 355827087278013. (lao)
Related: [-]
2 2 Search and Seizure Warrant Issued in case as to Apple iPhone Model A1660 FCC ID BCG-E3085A IC 579C-E3085A IMEI 355827087278013. (lao)
Related: [-]