Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-36419

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 4:18-ap-09037
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2018
Terminated:May 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neil Formisano
110 Lake Region Blvd.
Monroe, NY 10950
Represented By
Neil Formisano
contact info
Defendant
Christine Formisano
110 Lake Region Blvd.
Monroe, NY 10950
Represented By
Christine Formisano
contact info
Plaintiff
Aniello Formisano
Represented By
Mark Starkman
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/28 8:42 AM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-9037 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
22 22 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 05/21 12:26 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Not Held and Adjourned for Purposes only to 7/16/2019 at 08:30 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 11
21 21 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 05/21 12:16 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pre-trial Conference; Hearing Not Held, Adjourned for record purposes only to 7/16/2019 at 08:30 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
20 20 answer Consent Mon 05/20 5:53 PM
Consent Stipulation of Discontinuance filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Neil Formisano. (Poka, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
19 19 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 04/30 4:55 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE:Letter Withdrawing Complaint Filed by Mark Starkman on behalf of Aniello Formisano; Hearing Held and Adjourned for Record Purposes only to 5/21/2019 at 08:30 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 04/30 8:36 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Not Held and Adjourned to 5/21/2019 at 08:30 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 11
17 17 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 04/30 8:35 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre Trial Conference; Hearing Not Held and Adjourned to 5/21/2019 at 08:30 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/29 4:24 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-9037 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
16 16 1 pgs misc Letter Fri 04/26 1:39 PM
Letter Withdrawing Complaint Filed by Mark Starkman on behalf of Aniello Formisano. with hearing to be held on 4/30/2019 at 12:00 PM at Office of UST (355 Main Street, Poughkeepsie) (Starkman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
15 15 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Tue 04/02 12:28 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Related [+] Filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano. (Poka, John)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
14 14 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 03/26 3:06 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Held, Settled, Adjourned for Record Purposes Only to 4/30/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 03/26 2:59 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre Trial Conference; Hearing Held and Adjourned for record purposes only to 4/30/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
12 12 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Wed 03/06 10:31 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Held and Adjourned to 3/26/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Wed 03/06 10:29 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre Trial Conference; Hearing Held and Adjourned to 3/26/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
10 10 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 02/12 4:26 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Not Held and adjourned to 3/5/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 11
9 9 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 02/12 4:24 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pretrial Conference; Hearing Not Held and adjourned to 3/5/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
8 8 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 01/24 11:01 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano; Hearing Held and Adjourned to 2/12/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (DeCicco, Vincent)
Related: [-] 11
7 7 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 01/24 10:52 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Pre Trial Conference; Hearing Held and Adjourned to 2/12/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street (DeCicco, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
6 6 misc Letter Wed 01/02 2:04 PM
Letter Ap 18-09037 Answer to Complaint Exhibit A uploaded was incorrect, new Exhibit A is hereby attached, documents served included the correct exhibit A Filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Neil Formisano. with hearing to be held on 1/15/2019 at 10:15 AM at Office of UST (355 Main Street, Poughkeepsie) (Poka, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
5 5 answer|cmp None|Counterclaim Fri 12/28 11:04 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim against Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano filed by John A. Poka on behalf of Christine Formisano, Neil Formisano. with hearing to be held on 1/15/2019 at 10:15 AM at Office of UST (355 Main Street, Poughkeepsie)(Poka, John)
Related: [-] 1 1
Att: 1 Attorney Affirmation
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Verified Answer to Complaint File in Supreme Court
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Gift Letter from Plaintiff to Debtor
Att: 4 Exhibit C,D,E, and F, Order of Protection- Debtor/Plaintiff and Complaints
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, December 20, 2018
4 4 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 12/20 3:58 PM
Stipulation signed on 12/20/2018 extending the time to answer. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
3 3 other Certificate, Service Tue 11/20 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint with Exhibits "A" and "B" filed by Mark Starkman on behalf of Aniello Formisano. (Starkman, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 11/20 10:22 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 10:15 AM at Poughkeepsie Courthouse - 355 Main Street. Answer due by 12/20/2018. (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 11/19 10:44 AM
Adversary case 18-09037 Complaint against Neil Formisano, Christine Formisano (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Filed by Mark Starkman on behalf of Aniello Formisano. (Starkman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Supreme Court Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Transcript of Proceedings in Supreme Court