Utah County v. Purdue Pharma Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46184 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Utah, 2:18-cv-00784 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:54 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma
|
|
Defendant
Albertson's LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Utah County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:56 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Utah County is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3119600) filed by Utah County. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Muir, P.) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Peter J. Mougey and Jeffrey Gaddy, for Plaintiff Utah County. (nl) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney J. Burton LeBlanc and Laura J. Baughman, for Plaintiff Utah County. (nl) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/10/2018. (las) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re National Prescription Opiate Litigation MDL 2804 signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel (rks) [Transferred from utd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Utah. Case number 2:18-cv-00784. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |