Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46186 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Western, 5:18-cv-00994 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:55 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Bios Companies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:34 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Plaintiffs' Original Complaint and Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2788393. (Hoss, Henry) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc filed by Bios Companies Inc(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(Individually).(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoss, Henry) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
3 | 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D Spencer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
4 | 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon P Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, Brandon) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard D Nix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nix, Richard) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Watson Laboratories Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
8 | 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Purdue Pharma Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
10 | 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
11 | 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). McKesson Corporation served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
12 | 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Mallinckrodt LLC served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
13 | 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
14 | 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
15 | 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Insys Therapeutic Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
16 | 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Cephalon Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
17 | 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Cardinal Health Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
18 | 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Anda Inc served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
19 | 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
20 | 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Allergan plc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
21 | 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Actavis Pharma Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
22 | 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Actavis LLC served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/26/2018.] | |
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:18-cv-00994. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |