New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Taryn A Merkl
Referred: Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:18-cv-06716
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2018
Terminated:Jan 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2019 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By
Edward Thomas Decker
contact info
Adam Hakki
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jun Zhang
Defendant
Qiong Wang
Defendant
Neil Nanpeng Shen
Defendant
PPDAI Group Inc.
Represented By
Michael Charles Griffin
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Robert Alexander Fumerton
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Scott D. Musoff
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zehui Liu
Defendant
Tiezheng Li
Defendant
Congliang Li
Defendant
Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc.
Represented By
Edward Thomas Decker
contact info
Adam Hakki
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Honghui Hu
Defendant
Simon Tak Leung Ho
Defendant
Shaofeng Gu
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By
Edward Thomas Decker
contact info
Adam Hakki
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Cao
Plaintiff
Kitty Fong
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Golden Section Holding Corporation
Represented By
Phillip Kim
Rosen Law Firm, P.A. P.C.
contact info
Laurence Matthew Rosen
Laurence Rosen, Esq.
contact info
Yu Shi
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yogendra Goyal
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jing Lin
Represented By
Eduard Korsinsky
Levi & Korsinsky
contact info
Plaintiff
Weichen Lai
Represented By
Phillip Kim
Rosen Law Firm, P.A. P.C.
contact info
Laurence Matthew Rosen
Laurence Rosen, Esq.
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2022
OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND AWARD OF FEES re Motion for Settlement Final Approval 76; Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Award to Plaintiffs 77. For the reasons discussed in the attached opinion and on the record during the 12/16/2021 Fairness Hearing, and as set forth in the attached orders, the Court certifies the class for the purposes of settlement and finds that the terms in the parties' Settlement Agreement 64 are fair, reasonable, and adequate. The Court also finds the requested attorneys' fees and expenses fair and reasonable given the contingent nature of the case and the substantial risks of non-recovery, the time and effort involved, and the result obtained for the Settlement Class. Therefore, the Court awards the requests for a fee in the amount of 33.33% (one-third) of the Settlement Amount and $69,681 in expenses. In addition, the Court approves of the requested award of $2,000 each for federal Plaintiffs Golden Section Holding Corporation and Weichen Lai, and state court Plaintiffs Ravindra Vora and Yizhong Huang, in consideration of their active participation in the respective actions. The Motion for Final Settlement Approval 76 is granted. The Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Award to Plaintiffs 77 is also granted. Concurrently with issuance of this opinion, the Court is issuing an Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval, an Order Approving the Plan of Allocation, and an Order Approving the Fees, Expenses, and Plaintiff Awards. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 1/21/2022. (Cahn, Gabriel)

Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
88 88 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Tue 08/16 5:41 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Class Action Settlement Fund86 is hereby granted. See attached Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 8/16/2022. (Cahn, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
87 87 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 08/12 4:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re86 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Class Action Settlement Fund Declaration of Jack Ewashko on Behalf of A.B. Data, Ltd. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Class Action Settlement Fund filed by Golden Section Holding Corporation, Weichen Lai. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-F
86 86 motion Disbursement of Funds Fri 08/12 4:25 PM
MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Class Action Settlement Fund by Golden Section Holding Corporation, Weichen Lai. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order