META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. DeVito Verdi, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-80304
Nebraska Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas L Saladino |
Case #: | 8:18-ap-08334 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DeVito Verdi, Inc.
100 5th Avenue 16th Floor
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc.
Frost Brown Todd LLC 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/17 9:52 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. . The motion to dismiss is granted. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (Text only order) (law) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/17 10:02 AM
Adversary Case Closed META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management v. DeVito Verdi, Inc. CASE DISMISSED on 4/17/19 . (nmw) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/16 3:41 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. (Severini, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Mediation Referral
Wed 01/16 11:32 AM
Notice of Mediation Referral. (Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/27 1:35 PM
Summons Issued on DeVito Verdi, Inc. Date Issued 11/27/2018, Answer Due 12/27/2018 . (nmw) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 11/27 1:06 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 18-08334 TLS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A7731125, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/27 1:04 PM
Adversary case 18-08334 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc. against DeVito Verdi, Inc.. NOS: 12 . Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Brian J. Koenig, Douglas L. Lutz, Erin P. Severini on behalf of META Advisors LLC on behalf of G-Estate Management Company, Inc. f/k/a Gordmans Management Company, Inc..Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Lutz, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |