DAVIS v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-02253 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday May 26, 2019 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
SANDY DAVIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 30, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 01/06 12:53 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (Moved Left No Forwarding Address) Mail sent to SANDY DAVIS Re:8 ORDER (djb) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/12 9:44 AM
ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A only, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/12/2019. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 12/03 10:10 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Order, (no filing) (djb) |
||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 11/01 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH OCTOBER 31, 2019 ORDER by SANDY DAVIS re6 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (PAREKH, BEHRAM) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/31 2:33 PM
ORDER granting 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Parekh is directed to promptly provide Ms. Davis with a copy of this Order and to file a written notice of compliance with the Court, together with an address for Ms. Davis where all future filings and correspondence involving her individual case should be directed. Plaintiff Sandy Davis will be permitted 30 days from the entry of this Order to retain substitute counsel. Ms. Davis must file a case review certification in accordance with the Order Regarding Case Review Process, ECF No. 1136, by December 2, 2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/31/2019. (Substitution of counsel by 12/2/2019 .) (djb) |
|
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/21 12:51 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the motions for leave to withdraw as counsel filed in the cases identified on Exhibit A by Attorney Behram Parekh. Before ruling on these motions, the Court needs additional information about the reported attorney-client conflicts from Mr. Parekh. Therefore, Mr. Parekh must be prepared to discuss these matters on the record, in an ex parte setting, on October 24, 2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2019. (djb) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/11 8:23 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb) |
||
Thursday, October 10, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 10/10 8:45 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SANDY DAVIS. (PAREKH, BEHRAM) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
8
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/02 9:37 AM
ORDER - All individual plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with an order of the Court, by October 14, 2019. Each plaintiffs response to the show cause order must be filed on the docket for his or her individual case only. Each plaintiff must also comply with the Courts Order, ECF No. 1176. Failure to comply with these Orders will result in dismissal of a case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2019. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/28 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/27 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4343505.), filed by SANDY DAVIS. (PAREKH, BEHRAM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, Bristol Myers Squibb, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, Otsuka America, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, Otsuka Pharmaceutical | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 11/28 8:02 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb) |