Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:18-mj-00472
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 28, 2018 12:14 AM MST
Defendant
Carlos Benavides-Mendoza (1)
Represented By
Michael Stanley Yucevicius
Michael Yucevicius Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Caitlin Bales Noel
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info

GPO Nov 27 2018
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Carlos Benavides-Mendoza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns on 11/27/2018.(ESL)

Docket last updated: 11/28/2018 12:52 AM MST
Friday, November 23, 2018
Arrest of Carlos Benavides-Mendoza on 11/23/2018. (MRH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 26, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Carlos Benavides-Mendoza. (MRH)
Related: [-]
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Initial Appearance as to Carlos Benavides-Mendoza held on 11/26/2018. FINANCIAL ABILITY STATEMENT TAKEN. Appointing Michael Stanley Yucevicius for defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. SPANISH Interpreter required. Appearances : AUSA Donald Pashayan for Caitlin NOel for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Yucevicius for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. SPANISH Interpreter Frank Barcelo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 3:21 pm to 3:26 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MJF)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 FINANCIAL ABILITY STATEMENT by Carlos Benavides-Mendoza. (ESL)
Related: [-]