Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:18-ap-05082
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Feb 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aerotek, Inc.
Corporation Service Company 50 West Broad Street Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Aerotek, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/20 10:01 AM
Disposition of Adversary 5:18-ap-5082 (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/20 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 5:18-ap-5082 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
11 11 2 pgs notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/06 9:01 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
10 10 1 pgs court Proceeding Memo Wed 01/30 10:06 AM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 1/30/19. Agreed entry on or before 7 days. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, January 24, 2019
9 9 misc Document Thu 01/24 4:27 PM
Document Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 1 ,8
Friday, December 28, 2018
8 8 misc Document Fri 12/28 11:21 AM
Document Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 2:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 12:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/10 4:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Aerotek, Inc. 12/4/2018 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
4 4 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 12/06 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Tue 12/04 11:19 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Aerotek, Inc. Answer due 1/3/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toledo AP Procedures Memo
Monday, December 03, 2018
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 12/03 1:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (spete crt)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Mon 12/03 3:06 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (bvohl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/28 8:55 AM
Adversary case 18-05082 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Aerotek, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 And 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A