Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:18-ap-05085
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Jan 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bassett Inc. d/b/a Bassett Mechanical
Cogency Global, Inc. 3958-D Brown Park Drive
Hilliard, OH 43026
Represented By
Bassett Inc. d/b/a Bassett Mechanical
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E., Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/13 2:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 5:18-ap-5085 Case Dismissed. (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/13 2:34 PM
Adversary Case 5:18-ap-5085 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
38 38 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/03 9:02 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
37 37 misc Document Tue 07/23 8:17 AM
Document Third Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 33
Saturday, June 29, 2019
36 36 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sun 06/30 12:27 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35
Thursday, June 27, 2019
35 35 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Thu 06/27 4:17 PM
Third Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 6/27/2019 Related [+]. The deadline for filing any motion for summary judgment is October 28, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
34 34 court Proceeding Memo Thu 06/27 10:39 AM
Proceeding Memo; Held; Motion Cut-off 10/28/2019 for Summary Judgment Motions. Related [+] (amari)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
33 33 misc Document Thu 06/27 9:27 AM
Document Second Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
32 32 notice Notice (PDF) Wed 06/26 9:41 AM
Notice of Service of Subpoena Filed by Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical.(Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Saturday, June 01, 2019
31 31 BNC Notice of Order on Motion for Leave to File Sun 06/02 12:21 AM
Notice of Order on Motion for Leave to File w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29
Thursday, May 30, 2019
30 30 court Support Document Thu 05/30 4:35 PM
Support Document Defendant Bassett, Inc.'s Rule 7012(b) Statement Filed by Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical Related [+]. (Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-] 11
29 29 order Leave to File Thu 05/30 4:14 PM
Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Related [+] Signed on 5/30/2019. Defendant Bassett, Inc. is granted leave to file its Rule 7012(b) Statement Instanter, provided, however, Exhibit 2 to Defendant's Motion [Doc. # 27] shall be separately docketed as its own entryas a supplement to its Answer [Doc. # 11]. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 27
28 28 court Notice of Filing Deficiency Thu 05/30 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY: Order not uploaded with filing. In this court, orders must be uploaded to ECF, not attached to Motions/Applications. Upload immediately using courts "Order Upload" menu. Related [+] (mshai)
Related: [-] 27 Leave to File
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
27 27 motion Leave to File Wed 05/29 4:20 PM
Motion for Leave to Fil Related [+] Filed by Defendant Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical (Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-] 25 Order (PDF)25 Order (PDF)
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant Bassett, Inc.'s Rule 7012(b) Statement
Sunday, May 26, 2019
26 26 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Mon 05/27 12:18 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/26/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Friday, May 24, 2019
25 25 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Fri 05/24 2:52 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure of the Defendant to File a Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) Statement in Conjunction with its Answer. Signed on 5/24/2019 Related [+]. Response due no later than 5/31/19 by 4:00 P.M. absent which Defendant will be deemed by the court to have consented to entry of final orders and judgment by the bankruptcy court in this adversary proceeding. (sheym crt)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint
24 24 3 pgs misc Document Fri 05/24 10:39 AM
Document Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 13 ,15
Sunday, May 05, 2019
23 23 BNC Notice of Order on Amended Order Mon 05/06 12:19 AM
Notice of Order on Amended Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Saturday, May 04, 2019
22 22 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sun 05/05 12:21 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
21 21 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sun 05/05 12:21 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, May 03, 2019
20 20 order Amended Order (PDF) Fri 05/03 8:09 AM
Amended Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 5/3/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Defendant must file a Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) statement regarding consent, as a supplement to the answer, by May 16, 2019. appearances will be permitted with separate advance notice to the court. ( (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 19 Set Hearing (PDF)
Thursday, May 02, 2019
19 19 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 05/02 4:53 PM
Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 5/2/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Defendant must file a Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) statement regarding consent, as a supplement to the answer, by May 16, 2019. appearances will be permitted with separate advance notice to the court. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
18 18 13 pgs order Order (PDF) Thu 05/02 4:09 PM
Stipulated Protective Order Signed on 5/2/2019 Related [+]. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Protective Order
17 17 court Proceeding Memo Thu 05/02 2:13 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held. Adjourned to 6/27/19. 1. No further schedule set at this time pending the further PTC set above.2. Court to review and enter requested protective order at Doc. # 16 w/out further notice or hearing if it deems itappropriate.3. Def. to file Rule 7012(b) statement re consent, as supplement to answer. Due 14 days. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
16 16 motion Protective Order Wed 05/01 4:05 PM
Motion for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
15 15 misc Document Wed 04/24 4:59 PM
Document Stipulation Extending Non-Expert Discovery Deadline Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, February 01, 2019
14 14 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sat 02/02 12:20 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
13 13 order Set Hearing (PDF) Wed 01/30 2:44 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 1/30/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by May 30, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by July 5, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by April 26, 2019. The deadline to file Amended Pleadings without separate and further leaveof court is April 26, 2019. No motion deadline is being set at this time pending completion of discovery and the further pretrial conference set above. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 court Proceeding Memo Wed 01/30 12:33 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 1/30/19. Motion Cut off - Not Set at this time. Discovery Cut Off 4/26/19. Amended Pleadings 4/26/19. Further Pre Trial 5/2/19 @11 AM. Rule 26(a)(1)(2) Disclosure of Witness - 1. No Rule 26(a)(1)disclosures required. 2. Plffs Rule 26(a)(2) expert(s) disclosure and report due by 5/30/19. 3. Defs Rule 26(a)(2) expert(s)disclosure and report due 7/5/19. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 17, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/17 2:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical. (Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/17 2:49 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical. (Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 01/02 3:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical. (Carson, Jay aty)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Document Wed 01/02 11:51 AM
Document Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/10 4:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical 12/4/2018 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
4 4 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 12/06 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Tue 12/04 11:29 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Bassett Inc. dba Bassett Mechanical Answer due 1/3/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toledo AP Procedures Memo
Monday, December 03, 2018
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 12/03 1:53 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (spete crt)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Mon 12/03 3:09 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (bvohl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/28 9:31 AM
Adversary case 18-05085 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Bassett Inc. d/b/a Bassett Mechanical. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A