Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:18-ap-05096
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Jan 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
50 West Broad Street Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E., Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/13 2:37 PM
Disposition of Adversary 5:18-ap-5096 Case Dismissed. (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/13 2:38 PM
Adversary Case 5:18-ap-5096 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/14 5:08 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
15 15 court Proceeding Memo Thu 05/02 2:17 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 5/2/19. Agreed entry on or before 3 days. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, February 08, 2019
14 14 court Certificate of Service Fri 02/08 2:39 PM
Certificate of Service / Affidavit of Service of Laura Guido Filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Richards, Erica aty). Related document(s)13 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. Modified on 2/8/2019 (dzeme)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/08 12:45 PM
Answer to Complaint / Answer and Affirmative Defenses of UPS Ground Freight, Inc. to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Filed by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Richards, Erica aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/06 5:05 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice / Motion to Admit Erica Jean Richards Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant UPS Ground Freight, Inc. (Richards, Erica aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Friday, February 01, 2019
11 11 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sat 02/02 12:20 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, January 30, 2019
10 10 order Set Hearing (PDF) Wed 01/30 2:49 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 1/30/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/2/2019 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by May 30, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by July 5, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by April 26, 2019. The deadline to file Amended Pleadings without separate and further leave of court is April 26, 2019. No motion deadline is being set at this time pending completion of discovery and the further pretrial conference set above. By separate stipulation of the parties [Doc. # 8], Defendants answer or other response to the Complaint must be filed on or before February 8, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 court Proceeding Memo Wed 01/30 1:26 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 1/30/19. Discovery Cutoff (non expert) 4/26/19, Amended Pleadings 4/26/19, Further Pre Trial 5/2/19 @ 11:30 AM. RULE 26(a)(1)(2) DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES 1. No Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures required. 2. Plff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert(s) disclosure and report due 5/30/19. 3. Def's Rule 26(a)(2) expert(s) disclosure and report due 7/5/19. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 14, 2019
8 8 misc Document Mon 01/14 7:44 AM
Document Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/11 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/10 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on UPS Ground Freight, Inc. 12/4/2018 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
4 4 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 12/06 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Tue 12/04 12:25 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) UPS Ground Freight, Inc. Answer due 1/3/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toledo AP Procedures Memo
Monday, December 03, 2018
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 12/03 1:58 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (spete crt)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Mon 12/03 3:46 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (bvohl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/28 10:39 AM
Adversary case 18-05096 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A