Neo4j, Inc. v. PureThink, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-07182 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 1:52 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
PureThink, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter-claimant
John Mark Suhy
|
Represented By
|
Counter-claimant
iGov, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
Neo4j, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
PureThink, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PureThink, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Mark Suhy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
iGov, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neo4j, Inc.
111 E. 5th Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 03/22 10:03 AM
[LINK:REMINDER] COUNSEL MUST UPDATE PACER/ECF ACCOUNT in order for new firm information to be reflected on the case docket. [err102] Re:246 Notice of Change of Address filed by Neo4j Sweden AB, Neo4j, Inc. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
247 | 247
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 03/21 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff (Ratinoff, Jeffrey) |
|
246 | 246
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 03/21 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John V. Picone, III (Picone, John) |