Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:18-cv-01884
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Apr 10, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Wyatt Poff
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Leon T. Kenworthy
contact info
Benjamin Chapin
contact info
David W. Bowker
contact info
Jamie S. Gorelick
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Randa Wahbe
Center for Constitutional Rights 666 Broadway 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012
Represented By
Diala Shamas
contact info
Baher Azmy
contact info
Katherine Gallagher
contact info
Maria C. LaHood
contact info
Astha Sharma Pokharel
contact info
Misty A. Seemans
Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Village Council of Jalud
Center for Constitutional Rights 666 Broadway 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012
Represented By
Diala Shamas
contact info
Baher Azmy
contact info
Katherine Gallagher
contact info
Maria C. LaHood
contact info
Astha Sharma Pokharel
contact info
Misty A. Seemans
Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Municipality of 'Anata
Center for Constitutional Rights 666 Broadway 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012
Represented By
Diala Shamas
contact info
Baher Azmy
contact info
Katherine Gallagher
contact info
Maria C. LaHood
contact info
Astha Sharma Pokharel
contact info
Misty A. Seemans
Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Ziad Alwan
Center for Constitutional Rights 666 Broadway 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012
Represented By
Diala Shamas
contact info
Baher Azmy
contact info
Katherine Gallagher
contact info
Maria C. LaHood
contact info
Astha Sharma Pokharel
contact info
Misty A. Seemans
Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Shapiro
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
David Tesler
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Lewis Weinger
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Sidney Eddy Strulovits
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheri Lynn Strulovits
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Yair Spolter
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Silber
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Moriyah Shapiro
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey T. Schwartz
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Rabin
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Lynn Marx
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Charles Marx
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Gulie Madiel
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Madiel
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Alon Madiel
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Inbal Nazdare Levy
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Tsofiya Jacob
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Jacob
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Plaintiff
Moshe Gordon
Represented By
Sean M. Brennecke
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info
Robert J. Tolchin
contact info
David S. Eagle
Klehr, Harrison, Harvey, Branzburg & Ellers
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2019
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion to Proceed with Claims (D.I. 19) is DENIED, and the Motion to Intervene (D.I. 13) is DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2019. (nms)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, August 23, 2019
23 23 3 pgs order Order - -Memorandum and Order Fri 08/23 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion to Proceed with Claims (D.I.19 ) is DENIED, and the Motion to Intervene (D.I.13 ) is DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/23/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
22 22 respm Brief - Reply Thu 05/23 8:12 PM
REPLY BRIEF re19 MOTION To Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs filed by Ziad Alwan, Municipality of 'Anata, Village Council of Jalud, Randa Wahbe. (Seemans, Misty)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
21 21 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Mon 05/13 6:00 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re19 MOTION To Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs filed by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, Lewis Weinger.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2019. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Wed 04/24 12:30 PM
SO ORDERED, re20 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing on Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Proceed with Claims (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re19 MOTION To Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs. Answering Brief due 5/13/2019, Reply Brief due 5/23/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
20 20 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Tue 04/23 2:39 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing on Proposed Intervenors Motion To Proceed With Claims re19 MOTION To Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, Lewis Weinger. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/11 7:30 AM
MOTION To Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs - filed by Ziad Alwan, Municipality of 'Anata, Village Council of Jalud, Randa Wahbe. (Seemans, Misty) Modified on 4/11/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]
utility -SET ANSWERING BRIEF - no open brief w/ Motion Thu 04/11 10:18 AM
Set Answering Brief Deadline re19 MOTION to Proceed with Claims Brought by Ziad Alwan, Village of Jalud, Municipality of Anata, and Randa Wahbe Against Settler-plaintiffs. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/25/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/10 10:37 AM
SO ORDERED Granting17 Stipulation of Dismissal (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/10/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/09 4:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, Lewis Weinger. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Mon 04/01 10:49 AM
SO ORDERED, re16 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing on Motion to Intervene (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re13 MOTION to Intervene. Answering Briefs due 5/6/2019, Reply Brief due 5/21/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
16 16 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 03/29 4:18 PM
STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing on Motion to Intervene by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, Lewis Weinger. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 03/22 10:29 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Baher Azmy, Diala Shamas, Astha Sharma Pokharel, Maria C. LaHood, and Katherine Gallagher for Ziad Alwan, Municipality of 'Anata, Village Council of Jalud, and Randa Wahbe added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 03/18 10:06 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs' response to Airbnb's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, and Airbnb's reply in support of its motion to April 9, 2019 and April 30, 2019, respectively - filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 7:34 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Diala Shamas, Maria C. LaHood, Katherine Gallagher, Astha Sharma Pokharel, and Baher Azmy - filed by Ziad Alwan, Municipality of 'Anata, Village Council of Jalud, Randa Wahbe. (Seemans, Misty) Modified on 3/18/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Intervene Mon 03/18 7:28 AM
MOTION to Intervene - filed by Ziad Alwan, Village Council of Jalud, Municipality of 'Anata, Randa Wahbe.(Seemans, Misty) Modified on 3/18/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Mon 03/18 9:56 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motions filed at D.I. 15, 16, 17, and 18 have been removed from the docket as they were all duplicative of the motion filed at D.I.14 . (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Mon 03/18 9:58 AM
SO ORDERED, re14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearances, filed by Municipality of 'Anata, Village Council of Jalud, Randa Wahbe, Ziad Alwan. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
utility -SET ANSWERING BRIEF - no open brief w/ Motion Mon 03/18 11:23 AM
Set Answering Brief Deadline re13 MOTION to Intervene. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/1/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Mon 03/18 2:07 PM
SO ORDERED, re15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Motion to Dismiss (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re8 MOTION to Dismiss. (Answering Brief due 4/9/2019, Reply Brief due 4/30/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 01/31 10:14 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leon T. Kenworthy,Jamie S. Gorelick,Benjamin Chapin,David W. Bowker for Airbnb, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 01/29 5:55 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Declaration Tue 01/29 5:53 PM
DECLARATION re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim ,9 Opening Brief in Support, - Declaration of Kyle Miller - by Airbnb, Inc..(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 misc Declaration Tue 01/29 5:51 PM
DECLARATION re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim ,9 Opening Brief in Support, - Declaration of Adam W. Poff - by Airbnb, Inc..(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E
9 9 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Tue 01/29 5:48 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim filed by Airbnb, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2019. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Subject Jurisdiction Tue 01/29 5:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim - filed by Airbnb, Inc..(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/08 12:55 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamie S. Gorelick, David W. Bowker, Benjamin Chapin, and Leon T. Kenworthy - filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Tue 01/08 1:33 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamie S. Gorelick, David W. Bowker, Benjamin Chapin, and Leon T. Kenworthy, filed by Airbnb, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/8/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 01/07 11:17 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert J. Tolchin for Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Yair Spolter, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, David Tesler, and Lewis Weinger added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
6 6 cmp Complaint - Amended Fri 12/21 1:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Airbnb, Inc.- filed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter.(Eagle, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 12/21 10:17 AM
SO ORDERED, re5 STIPULATION Order for Extension (*Reset Deadlines: Airbnb, Inc. answer due 1/29/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/26/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/21/2018. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
5 5 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 12/20 10:07 AM
STIPULATION Order for Extension - filed by Airbnb, Inc.. (Poff, Adam) Modified on 12/20/2018 (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/06 12:22 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 12/06 4:39 PM
SO ORDERED, re3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Tolchin, filed by Danielle Madiel, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Moshe Gordon, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Alon Madiel, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Howard Rabin, Gulie Madiel, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Samuel Silber. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2018. (nms)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/30 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter. Airbnb, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 11/30 9:03 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Airbnb, Inc. on 11/30/2018. (rwc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/29 10:19 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert J. Tolchin - filed by Moshe Gordon, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Danielle Madiel, Gulie Madiel, Eric Charles Marx, Susan Lynn Marx, Howard Rabin, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Jonathan Shapiro, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber. (Brennecke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 11/28 3:34 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ddp)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/28 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Airbnb, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2513128.) - filed by Danielle Madiel, Sheri Lynn Strulovits, Moriyah Shapiro, Samuel Silber, Howard Rabin, Daniel Jacob, Tsofiya Jacob, Jonathan Shapiro, Inbal Nazdare Levy, Alon Madiel, Sidney Eddy Strulovits, Eric Charles Marx, Jeffrey T. Schwartz, Susan Lynn Marx, Lewis Weinger, Gulie Madiel, Moshe Gordon, Yair Spolter.(ddp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Wed 11/28 3:35 PM
No Summons Issued. (ddp)
Related: [-]