New York Northern District Court
Judge:Lawrence E Kahn
Referred: Andrew T Baxter
Case #: 1:18-cv-01372
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Jun 17, 2019

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, July 22, 2019
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Mon 07/22 10:41 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. 2412. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 22, 2019. (sas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
19 19 misc Stipulation Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
STIPULATION to Award Fees Under the Equal Access to JUstice Act (EAJA) by Nancy A. Berryhill submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (Luis, Pere)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner - Pilot Tue 06/25 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Pere Luis appearing for Commissioner of Social Security as substituted counsel for Desir, James . (Luis, Pere)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
17 17 order Judgment Mon 06/17 2:32 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in the above entitled action, the case is DISMISSED in favor of the Plaintiff and against the Defendant and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings in accordance with the CONSENT ORDER to REMAND of the Honorable Lawrence E. Kahn, U. S. District Judge, dated June 17, 2019. (sas)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Mon 06/17 2:19 PM
CONSENT ORDER TO REMAND PURSUANT TO SENTENCE 4 of 42 U.S. C. § 405 (g). Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 06/17/19. (sas)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Mon 06/17 9:40 AM
STIPULATION re10 Social Security Plaintiff's Brief by Nancy A. Berryhill submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn.(Luis, Pere)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Thursday, May 30, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner - Pilot Thu 05/30 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Pere Luis appearing for Commissioner of Social Security as co-counsel with Daniel Stice Tarabelli; James Desir . (Luis, Pere)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
13 13 order Order on Letter Request Tue 05/28 3:09 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting12 Letter Request for an extension of time. Defendant's brief is to be filed on or before 6/28/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/28/2019. (nmk)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 05/28 10:53 AM
Letter Motion from Daniel Tarabelli for Nancy A. Berryhill requesting an extension of time until June 28, 2019, to file a response to Plaintiffs brief submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner - Pilot Mon 04/22 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Stice Tarabelli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security as co-counsel with James Desir . (Tarabelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
10 10 misc Social Security Plaintiff Brief Fri 04/12 8:34 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Danielle Hisert. Defendant Brief due by 5/28/2019. (Smith, Christen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
9 9 misc Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript - Pilot Thu 02/28 10:08 AM
Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript. Plaintiff Brief due by 4/15/2019. (Desir, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner - Pilot Fri 11/30 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Desir appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 2/28/2019. (Desir, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/28 4:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/28/2018. (nmk)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Reassigning Case (Text-Order) Wed 11/28 4:06 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (plp)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent / Declination Form - Pilot Wed 11/28 11:56 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Danielle Hisert advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Smith, Christen) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/28/2018) (hmr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form - Pilot Wed 11/28 11:01 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 12/19/2018. (jdp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/28 11:00 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Danielle Hisert. (jdp, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Social Security Identification Form - Pilot [LODGED] Social Security Identification Form - Pilot [LODGED] Wed 11/28 11:00 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (jdp, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmpssa Complaint - Social Security Appeal Wed 11/28 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(jdp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Wed 11/28 12:34 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re5 Social Security Consent / Declination Form: Clerk replaced this document with a flatten version, so that no changes can be made to the document. (hmr)
Related: [-]