Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gene Ek Pratter
Case #: 2:18-cv-05132
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction Against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2018
Terminated:Apr 17, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2019 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
HAIXIN YANG
Represented By
BRENDAN HENNESSY
Hennessy Law
contact info
Plaintiff
HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC
Represented By
GERALD E. BURNS
Buchanan Ingersoll Rooney PC
contact info
MARK ALLEN KASTEN
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 06, 2019
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/06 1:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
31 31 misc Status Report Fri 08/30 1:54 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
30 30 misc Status Report Fri 08/23 2:48 PM
STATUS REPORT {JOINT} by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
29 29 misc Status Report Fri 08/16 5:18 PM
STATUS REPORT {JOINT} by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 08/09 1:46 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
27 27 order Status Report Order Thu 07/25 2:15 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 8/9/2019.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/25/2019. 7/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
26 26 misc Status Report Fri 06/28 1:43 PM
STATUS REPORT {Status Update per Order dated 06.17.2019} by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 3:13 PM
ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A WRITTEN STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT BY JUNE 28, 2019 CONCERNING THE STATUS OF THEIR SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/17/19. 6/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 05/17 3:54 PM
STATUS REPORT {Status Update per Order dated 04.17.2019} by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
23 23 order Suspense Order Wed 04/17 3:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A WRITTEN STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT BY MAY 17, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/17/2019. 4/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 04/12 1:47 PM
STATUS REPORT {Joint Status Update per Order dated 04.04.2019} by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/05 10:45 AM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A WRITTEN STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT BY APRIL 12, 2019 REGARDING HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLCS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. NO.5 ) AND THE PARTIES NEED, IF ANY, FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY ON THIS MOTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/2/19. 4/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
20 20 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Thu 02/07 4:37 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION THAT HAIXIN YANG ANSWER BY 2/19/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/6/19. 2/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation
Friday, January 25, 2019
19 19 minutes Status Conference Fri 01/25 2:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Status Conference held on 1/25/19. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/16 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/25/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/09 4:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by HAIXIN YANG.(HENNESSY, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 20, 2018
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/20 12:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC. HAIXIN YANG waiver sent on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
15 15 minutes Status Conference Thu 12/20 11:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Status Conference held on 12/17/18. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 12/19 9:00 AM
ORDER THAT MR. YANGS FIRST MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.10 ) IS DEEMED MOOT FOR THE REASONS DISCUSSED DURING THE STATUS CONFERENCE; AND AS DISCUSSED DURING THE STATUS CONFERENCE, THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A WRITTEN STATUS UPDATE TO THE COURT BY DECEMBER 21, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/17/18. 12/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/11 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/17/2018 AT 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
12 12 trial Exhibit Mon 12/10 4:40 PM
EXHIBIT A to11 RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by HAIXIN YANG.. (HENNESSY, BRENDAN) Modified on 12/10/2018 (md)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/10 2:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by HAIXIN YANG.(HENNESSY, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 07, 2018
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 12/07 9:34 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss filed by HAIXIN YANG.Certificate of Service.(HENNESSY, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 06, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/06 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK ALLEN KASTEN on behalf of HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC with Certificate of Service(KASTEN, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/05 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN HENNESSY on behalf of HAIXIN YANG (HENNESSY, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 12/04 4:56 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION (DOC. NO.3 ) IS DEEMED WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/30/18. 12/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Expedite Tue 12/04 4:22 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service.(BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Exhibit s A - I
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 12/04 4:13 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service.(BURNS, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Exhibit s A - G
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/28 4:54 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING EMERGENCY HEARING FOR 11/29/2018 AT 8:30 AM IN COURTROOM 14B BEFORE CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/28/2018. 11/29/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stwe, )
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 11/28 4:47 PM
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC., BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY) Wed 11/28 4:40 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC.(mbh, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/28 4:36 PM
Complaint against HAIXIN YANG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE188496.)filed by HERAEUS PRECIOUS METALS NORTH AMERICA CONSHOHOCKEN, LLC.(mbh, ) (mbh, ). (mbh, ). (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/28/2018) Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 2 (11/28/2018) Case Management Track
Att: 3 (11/28/2018) Designation form
service Summons Issued Wed 11/28 4:37 PM
Summons Issued as to HAIXIN YANG. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/28/18 (mbh, )
Related: [-]