Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referred: Bruce J Mcgiverin
Case #: 3:18-cv-01916
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2018
Terminated:Jan 24, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2019 5:20 AM AST
Defendant
Doctors' Center Hospital San Juan, Inc.
1395 San Rafael Street, Santurce, Puerto Rico 00919 P.O. Box 30532, Manat, Puerto Rico, 00674-0532
Santurce, PR 00919
Represented By
Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
contact info
Plaintiff
Aixa Rosa Tonge
6929 13th Ave.
Kenosha, WI 53142
Represented By
Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Latimer, Biaggi, Rachid & Godreau
contact info
Plaintiff
Hilda Tonge-Landron
5831 S Claremont Ave.
Chicago, IL 60636
Represented By
Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Latimer, Biaggi, Rachid & Godreau
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Tonge-Landron
W4102 Ober Road
Coonvalley, WI 54623
Represented By
Rafael Mayoral-Morales
Latimer, Biaggi, Rachid & Godreau
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2021
OPINION AND ORDER re 45 MOTION to dismiss THE AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT as to Galope Anesthesia Services PSC, Ricardo Galan-Vazquez, 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 49 MOTION requesting Order to Deem CCC's Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed, 50 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 4, 2020 to File Response/Reply & Opposition to Motion at D.E. 49 as to 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,54 MOTION for Leave to File Document , 55 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Continental Casualty Company. 56 MOTION for Joinder CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANYS (DKT 55) REPLY TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS TO MOTION TO DISMISS Re: 55 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Continental Casualty Compan filed by Ricardo Galan-Vazquez, Galope Anesthesia Services PSC, 57 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Dr. Jorge L. Lopez, 61 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Dr. Jorge L. Lopez, Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/31/2021.(wm)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
99 99 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 11/08 11:14 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to95 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marissa Garcia-Tonge, Barbara Garcia-Tonge; VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED. RE:98 USCA JUDGMENT. (mcm)
Related: [-]
98 98 appeal USCA Judgment Tue 11/08 11:11 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to95 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marissa Garcia-Tonge, Barbara Garcia-Tonge; Upon consideration of appellant's unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (mcm)
Related: [-]