Breckinridge County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46273 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Western, 3:18-cv-00714 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:56 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Breckinridge County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:15 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2743328).. (VS) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Tendered Summons | ||
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (VS) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued Summonses.. (VS) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons issued as to Amerisource, | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued as to Cardinal, | ||
Att: 3 Summons issued to Endo, | ||
Att: 4 Summons issued as to Janssen, | ||
Att: 5 Summons issued as to Mallinckrodt, | ||
Att: 6 Summons issued as to McKesson, | ||
Att: 7 Summons issued as to Purdue, | ||
Att: 8 Summons issued as to Teva | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE Complaint (Corrected) by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court re1 Complaint,,, (Grabhorn, Michael) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - This case is REASSIGNED to the docket of Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials TBR on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, Judge Russell-CM (DAK) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/20/2018. Extension of time to answer/respond up to 1/4/2019.cc:counsel (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re4 by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Hammond, Lori) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC.. by Mallinckrodt LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-67 from ND/OH re MDL 2804. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00714. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |