City of Henderson Kentucky v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46276 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Western, 4:18-cv-00169 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:57 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
8909 East Avenue
Mentor, OH 44060 |
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
30 HUNTER LN.
CAMP BILL, PA 17011 |
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Henderson Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:22 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2743297., filed by City of Henderson Kentucky. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Summons as to Amerisource, | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to Cardinal, | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to Endo, | ||
Att: 4 Summons as to Janssen, | ||
Att: 5 Summons as to Mallinckrodt, | ||
Att: 6 Summons as to McKesson, | ||
Att: 7 Summons as to Purdue, | ||
Att: 8 Summons as to Teva | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/30/18: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
5 | 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to LR 40.1(b), the cases listed below shall be REASSIGNED to the docket of Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell for final disposition. The interests of justice will be served by one judge handling these related cases and all similarly related cases which may later be filed.cc: Counsel, KL, KH (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/26/2018: Defendants are granted an extension of time to and including 1/4/2019 within which to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. If, however, this action is transferred to MDL No. 2804, In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, before 1/4/2019, then any deadline to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint will be governed by MDL procedures and/or orders. cc: counsel (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re1 by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Hammond, Lori) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
9 | 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC.. by Mallinckrodt LLC.. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-67 from ND/OH re MDL 2804. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 11/28/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 4:18-cv-00169. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |