Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen K Caldwell
Referred: Edward B Atkins
Case #: 0:18-cv-00112
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2018
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 28, 2019 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Boyd County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Carl Hall
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
BJ Kimmle
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Bobby Jack Woods
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Boyd County Fiscal Court
Defendant
David White
Official Defendant
Carl Hall
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Official Defendant
BJ Kimmle
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Official Defendant
Bobby Jack Woods
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Russell Helms
Represented By
Kevan Morgan
Morgan Law Office, PLC
contact info
James M. Francis
Francis Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Oran Smith
Terminated: 05/03/2019
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info
Official Defendant
Oran Smith
Terminated: 05/03/2019
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Mando
Adams, Stepner, Woltermann & Dusing, PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 20 2024
with this opinion. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/20/24.(KSS)cc: COR OPINION & ORDER: 1) Def's motion for summary judgment DE91 is GRANTED; 2) The Court will enter judgment in favor of Sergeant Hall, Deputy Kimmle, Deputy White, and Sheriff Woods in their individual capacities and in favor of Boyd County on all constitutional claims asserted against them; 3) The Court will enter judgment in favor of Boyd County on the ADA Title II claim; 4) The Court will dismiss all claims against Sergeant Hall, Deputy Kimmle, Deputy White, and Sheriff Woods in their official capacities and against the Boyd County Sheriff's Department and Boyd County Fiscal Court; 5) Def's motion to strike the report and testimony of Plf's experts DE99 is DENIED as moot; and 6) Judgment will be entered consistent

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 19, 2024
122 122 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 09/19 1:28 PM
USCA Case Number 24-5853 Case Manager Virginia Lee Padgett for121 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathy Helms. (JLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
121 121 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 09/18 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to118 Judgment,,, by Kathy Helms. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AKYEDC-5927040. (Francis, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
120 120 misc Costs Taxed Tue 09/17 3:03 PM
Clerk's Taxation of Costs in amount of $2,932.03 against Plaintiff. cc: COR (JLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
utility File Submitted Mon 09/16 4:01 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO Robert R. Carr, Clerk for review:119 BILL OF COSTS. (JLS)
Related: [-]