Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:18-cv-00846
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2018
Terminated:Oct 02, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2019 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
The E.W. Scripps Company
312 Walnut Street Suite 2800
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
M Scott McIntyre
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jonathan Kelly
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scripps Media Inc.
Represented By
M Scott McIntyre
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jonathan Kelly
Baker & Hostetler, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Rosemeyer
5746 Glow Court
Cincinnati, OH 45238
Represented By
David A Eberly
Eberly Mcmahon Copetas LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2020
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 1/10/20. (eh)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 02, 2020
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/02 12:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Plaintiff Joseph Rosemeyer. (Eberly, David)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 10/02 3:05 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 08/25 2:02 PM
Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for a Settlement Conference held via video/teleconferencing on 8/25/2020.Counsel and parties for plaintiff and for defendants present. Settlement conference held. Parties are to follow up with the Court within 45 days. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
order Order Thu 08/13 9:53 AM
Order Setting Settlement Conference (via video/teleconference): Settlement Conference SET for Tues., 8/25/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and the current health restrictions that are in place, the Court will determine the method in which the mediation shall be conducted prior to the conference (in person appearance or by video conferencing/teleconferencing) . To the extent not already completed, at least 21 days prior to the Settlement Conference plaintiff shall submit a fully documented, written settlement demand to defendant. Defendant shall have 7 days to respond with a fully documented counter-offer . Ex Parte settlement statements are due to the Court no later than 8/18/2020 at Noon. Statements shall be submitted directly to chambers either by email at litkovitz_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov or by fax at (513) 564-7691 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/13/2020. (art)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
24 24 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/01 9:23 AM
ORDER RESETTING Settlement Conference re-set for Tues., 8/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/1/2020. ( COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT POSITION STATEMENTS TO THE COURT BY NOT LATER THAN NOON ON 8/18/2020. Settlement Statement should be sent to chambers email: litkovitz_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov ) (art)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/11 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company of J. Kelly Withdrawal as co-counsel (Kelly, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
22 22 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 12:57 PM
ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference set for Wed., 7/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. ( COUNSEL SHALL SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT POSITION STATEMENTS TO THE COURT BY NOT LATER THAN NOON ON 7/8/2020. Settlement Statement should be sent to chambers email: litkovitz_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov ) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/18/2020. (art)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/18 12:46 PM
Upon counsels' request, this CASE is REFERRED for the limited purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (art)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 4:24 PM
ORDER Terminating20 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct16 : Discovery due by 8/28/2020. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Cincinnati before Judge Matthew W. McFarland. Jury trial set for May 2021. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 02/12/2020. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Fri 02/07 2:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Preliminary Pretrial Order,, by Plaintiff Joseph Rosemeyer. (Eberly, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/15 3:13 PM
***Deadline terminated: The Settlement Conference set for May 6, 2020 is vacated. If the parties are interested in mediation, please contact the Magistrate Judge mentioned in the early docket entry that states "If this case is referred..." (ss)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
19 19 order Protective Order Fri 01/10 10:50 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 1/10/20. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
18 18 6 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/03 9:30 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/3/2020. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
misc Docket Annotation Tue 05/14 1:21 PM
All dates contained in Judge Barrett's Calendar Order (doc.#16) are hereby Adopted by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/02 1:46 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/2/19. (ba)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 05/02 1:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/2/2019; David Eberly appeared for Plaintiff; Jonathan Kelly appeared for Defendant; the matter shall be randomly reassigned by the Clerk's Office. (ba)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/29 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 4/29/2019; David Eberly appeared for Plaintiff; Jonathan Kelly appeared for Defendants; parties to confer regarding the Court's potential conflict; a follow up Status Conference is set for 5/2/2019 at 01:00 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 3/21/19 for conferencing instructions (ba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
16 16 order Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 03/21 4:14 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2019. Motions directed to pleadings due by 6/28/2019. Lay Witness due by 12/27/2019. Status Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 10:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 10/18/2019. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 1/24/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 12/20/2019. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Motions due by 3/20/2020. Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury trial 10/2020. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/21/19. (ba)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 02/22 11:50 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company. (Kelly, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
notice Notice of Deadline Fri 01/25 7:38 AM
NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/15/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/24 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Kelly for Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company (Kelly, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/24 3:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Scripps Media Inc.. (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/24 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by The E.W. Scripps Company. (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 01/03 4:42 PM
ORDER granting8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; Scripps Media Inc. and The E.W. Scripps Company answer due 1/30/19. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/3/19. (ba)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/21 5:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company identifying Corporate Parent The E.W. Scripps Company for Scripps Media Inc... (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/21 5:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The E.W. Scripps Company. (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/21 5:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/30/2019. by Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company. (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by M Scott McIntyre for Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company (McIntyre, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/18 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/13 2:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Scripps Media Inc. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 04, 2018
4 4 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 12/04 2:57 PM
Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/04 9:59 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Joseph Rosemeyer re1 Complaint, of Filing EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights (Eberly, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Right to Sue Letter
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/04 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Scripps Media Inc., The E.W. Scripps Company. (bjc)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 12/04 8:32 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/03 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6700647), filed by Joseph Rosemeyer. (Eberly, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Summons Form,
Att: 4 Summons Form,
Att: 5 Summons Form