County of San Luis Obispo, California v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46290 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:18-cv-09516 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:57 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V. f/k/a Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of San Luis Obispo, California
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:39 PM EDT |
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 170 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22722195 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff County of San Luis Obispo, California. (Attorney Aelish M Baig added to party County of San Luis Obispo, California(pty:pla))(Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff County of San Luis Obispo, California. (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff County of San Luis Obispo, California. (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff County of San Luis Obispo, California, (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. If party names do not fit in space provided, enter only the name of the first Defendant and write see attached, then attach face page of complaint or addendum to summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dorothy P Antullis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ellen Relkin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Sharp. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
11 | 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark J Dearman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Geller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Pennock. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
15 | 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff County of San Luis Obispo, California. (Baig, Aelish) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
17 | 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-68) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio at Cleveland and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 TRANSMITTAL LETTER - MDL CASE TRANSFER OUT: A certified copy of the MDL 2606 Transfer Order with electronic docket sheet sent to USDC Northern District of Ohio at Cleveland on 11/30/18. (bm) [Transferred from cacd on 12/3/2018.] | |
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 2:18-cv-09516. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |