Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. APPROVED FUNDING CORP.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01790 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
APPROVED FUNDING CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 13, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
![]() So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 1/13/2022 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/13 8:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1790 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Letter to the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman re: June 18, 2021 Letter Requesting Permission to Move for Stay of Depositions Filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Letter to the Honorable Shelly C. Chapman Filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP..(Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
35 | 35
![]() Letter Responding to LBHI's July 21, 2020 Letter Request Filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 9/15/20 at 10:00 AM RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/16/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/24/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/19/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/16/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Order Granting Offit Kurman, P.A.'s Motion to Withdraw signed on 9/17/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
Thursday, September 03, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Albena Petrakov on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Petrakov, Albena) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Certificate of Mailing. . Notice Date 08/27/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Status Conference; with hearing to be held Telephonically on 9/15/2020 at 11:00 a.m. (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Certificate of Mailing. . Notice Date 07/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Notice of Status Conference; with hearing to be held Telephonically on 8/26/2020 at 10:30 a.m. (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Letter to the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed on 2/28/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Motion for Attachment Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Approved Funding Inc filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Letter to the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Reply to Motion DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS RMBS COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(1) FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND STANDING filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Memorandum of Law of Plaintiff Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. In Opposition To Certain Defendants Omnibus Motion to Dismiss RMBS Complaints Pursuant To Rule 12(b)(1) For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Standing filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Amended Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Stipulation and Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Albena Petrakov on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Petrakov, Albena) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Stipulation and Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Albena Petrakov on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Petrakov, Albena) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() Omnibus Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. Responses due by 7/12/2019, (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service of the Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Fri 03/15 1:06 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as theCentral Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter Filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP..(Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Letter Filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP..(Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Affidavit Regarding Issuance of Summons Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding as Local Counsel filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Salter, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Tracy Lee Henderson on behalf of APPROVED FUNDING CORP.. (Henderson, Tracy) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 18-01790 Complaint against APPROVED FUNDING CORP. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |