Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by mer
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01820 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 10/14 9:13 AM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 10/14/2020 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/14 9:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1820 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
ans
Opposition Brief
Wed 05/20 7:55 PM
Opposition Brief of Wintrust Mortgage as Successor by Merger to SGB Corp., in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendants' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lilit Asadourian on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Asadourian, Lilit) |
|
23 | 23
ans
Statement
Wed 05/20 7:46 PM
Statement of Undisputed Facts/Defendants Response to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.'s Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lilit Asadourian on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Asadourian, Lilit) |
|
22 | 22
ans
Opposition Brief
Wed 05/20 7:36 PM
Opposition Brief / Defendants Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and in Support of Defendants Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lilit Asadourian on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Asadourian, Lilit) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Wed 05/20 7:30 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Notice of Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Lilit Asadourian on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Asadourian, Lilit) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Cross-Motion | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Amanda Lawrence | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-July 6, 2017 Hearing Transcript | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-Defendants Second Set of Common Interrogatories to LBHI | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C-LBHIs Amended Responses to Defendants Second Set of Common Interrogatories | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Common Requests for Admission | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Michael S. Leib | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-Notice of Rule 9019 Motion | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit B-May 8, 2017 Email | ||
Att: 10 Declaration of Lani Adler | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit A-May 24, 2017 Letter | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B-June 15, 2017 Letter | ||
Att: 13 Declaration of Tracy L. Henderson | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Tue 05/05 6:24 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
253
pgs
misc
Transcript
Mon 03/09 4:34 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 4:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 5:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/06 3:33 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Opposition
Fri 07/12 4:42 PM
Opposition Plaintiff Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Pro Forma Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 05/15 6:51 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Rule 7007.1 . Corporate parents added to case: Wintrust Financial Corporation. Filed by Michael S Leib on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Leib, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
answer
None
Mon 05/13 6:25 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Michael S Leib on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Leib, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Motion, Dismiss Case
Mon 05/13 4:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case , and, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Michael S Leib on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Leib, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/08 7:45 PM
Certificate of Service of the Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Reply
Sun 04/07 1:01 PM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/21 5:25 PM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Fri 03/15 1:06 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as theCentral Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
ans
Statement
Thu 03/14 7:34 PM
Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-4 of the Amended Case Management Order | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 03/06 3:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Lilit Asadourian on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Asadourian, Lilit) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 03/06 2:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Michael S Leib on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Leib, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 03/06 11:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Michael J. Venditto on behalf of WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION. (Venditto, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 7:26 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Tue 01/29 4:38 PM
Affidavit Regarding Issuance of Summons Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 12/04 5:35 PM
Adversary case 18-01820 Complaint against WINTRUST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, as successor by merger to SGB CORPORATION (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |