Nolasco et al v. Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-03754 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2019 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Mundo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Nolasco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Pineda
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MARGINAL ORDER Approving13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Anthony Cabrera, Pedro Mundo, Juan Pineda, Carlos Nolasco. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/26/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Cabrera, Pedro Mundo, Carlos Nolasco, Juan Pineda (Greenberg, Gregg) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC answer due 2/28/2019.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/31/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, [1-2] Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC(Niccolini, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE re6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Ng, Connie) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 12/11 2:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading to [1-2] Complaint due on or before 1/31/19. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/11/2018. (dafs, Chambers) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC(Niccolini, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Supplemental to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC Complaint(Ng, Connie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/7/2018. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Fri 12/07 10:34 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC was filed incorrectly. Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vinci, SA, Corporate Parent Prime Utility Services, LLC for Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Niccolini, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ross Niccolini on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Niccolini, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Connie May Ting Ng on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Ng, Connie) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-18-005750 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7711795), filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Ng, Connie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 12/06 1:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk) |