Maryland District Court
Judge:George Levi Russell, III
Case #: 1:18-cv-03754
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2018
Terminated:Feb 26, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2019 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Connie May Ting Ng
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Robert Ross Niccolini
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Cabrera
Represented By
Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Zipin, Amster And Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Mundo
Represented By
Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Zipin, Amster And Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Nolasco
Represented By
Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Zipin, Amster And Greenberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Pineda
Represented By
Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Zipin, Amster And Greenberg, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/26 11:38 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Anthony Cabrera, Pedro Mundo, Juan Pineda, Carlos Nolasco. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/26/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/25 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Cabrera, Pedro Mundo, Carlos Nolasco, Juan Pineda (Greenberg, Gregg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/31 2:20 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC answer due 2/28/2019.. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/31/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/31 10:49 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, [1-2] Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC(Niccolini, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
10 10 respm Response Wed 12/12 11:48 AM
RESPONSE re6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Ng, Connie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/11 2:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading to [1-2] Complaint due on or before 1/31/19. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/11/2018. (dafs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/10 12:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC(Niccolini, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 07, 2018
7 7 misc Supplemental Fri 12/07 11:44 AM
Supplemental to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC Complaint(Ng, Connie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Return of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report
6 6 order Standing Order Concerning Removal Fri 12/07 10:58 AM
Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/7/2018. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 12/07 10:34 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC was filed incorrectly. Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 12/06 1:06 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vinci, SA, Corporate Parent Prime Utility Services, LLC for Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Niccolini, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/06 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ross Niccolini on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Niccolini, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/06 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Connie May Ting Ng on behalf of Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC (Ng, Connie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/06 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-18-005750 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7711795), filed by Precision Pipeline Solutions, LLC.(Ng, Connie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Addl Circuit Court Filing,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-Decl. of W. Michael Walker,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing of Removal
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/06 1:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]