Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: James P O'Hara
Case #: 2:18-cv-02666
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2018
Re-opened:Dec 03, 2018
Terminated:Jan 22, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2019 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Four B Corp
Represented By
Leo L. Logan
Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - Op
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-4
Defendant
Prinston Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas P. Hill
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Llc - Kc
contact info
Nathan B. Reeder
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Llc - Kc
contact info
Alan Klein
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Seth A. Goldberg
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Hill
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Llc - Kc
contact info
Nathan B. Reeder
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Llc - Kc
contact info
Alan Klein
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Seth A. Goldberg
Duane Morris Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
Represented By
Daniel Sasse
Crowell & Moring Llp - Irvine
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Lynn W. Hursh
Armstrong Teasdale, Llp - Kc
contact info
Brian H. Rubenstein
Greenberg Traurig, Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Kathryn C. Bascom
Armstrong Teasdale, Llp - Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gentry
4040 W. 131st Terrace
Leawood, KS 66209
Represented By
Burton S. Haigh
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
Clayton Gillette
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
Louis C. Accurso
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Leann Gentry
4040 W. 131st Terrace
Leawood, KS 66209
Represented By
Burton S. Haigh
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
Clayton Gillette
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
Louis C. Accurso
The Accurso Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hen House Marketplace, LLC
Terminated: 11/30/2018


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
80 80 motion Dismiss Party Tue 01/22 9:26 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Plaintiffs James Gentry, Leann Gentry (Haigh, Burton) Modified title of document on 1/22/2019. Originally filed as a motion. (tvn)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/22 4:09 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 80 Stipulation of Dismissal. (tvn)
Related: [-]