Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:18-cr-20754
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 2:13 AM EST
Defendant
Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh (1)
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Collins
Collins & Collins, P.C.
contact info
Mohamad Issa Bazzi
Bazzi Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
April Nicole Russo
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 15 2020
ORDER Denying 44 Defendant's Amended Motion for Revocation of Detention Order. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)

Docket last updated: 12/08/2018 3:10 AM EST
Friday, October 26, 2018
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh (1). (SOso) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER WITH MOTION to Seal1 Complaint, 2 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (SOso) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: Initial Appearance as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh held on 10/30/2018. Detention Hearing set for 10/31/2018 01:00 PM . Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mohamad Bazzi) (AUSA: JR Drabick) (LHos) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal1 Complaint, 2 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LHos) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mohamad Issa Bazzi appearing for Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh (Bazzi, Mohamad) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh held on 10/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.8 MB) (NAhm) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (SOso) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub: Detention Hearing as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh held on 10/31/2018. Preliminary Examination set for 11/13/2018 01:00 PM . Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mohamad Bazzi) (AUSA: April Russo) (LHos) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh held on 10/31/2018 before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. AUDIO FILE SIZE (9.7 MB) (NAhm) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey G. Collins appearing for Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh (Collins, Jeffrey) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 STIPULATION by Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh. (Collins, Jeffrey) [2:18-mj-30570-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 9 pgs INDICTMENT as to Kevin Kuo-Chun Hsieh (1) count(s) 1-2, 3, 4-5, 6. (SSch)
Related: [-]