Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-28713

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brett H Ludwig
Case #: 2:18-ap-02253
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2018
Terminated:Aug 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Steven Wolfington, Defendant
1603 County Road V
Sheboygan, WI 53081
Represented By
Richard A. Check
Bankruptcy Law Office Of Richard A. Check
contact info
Plaintiff
Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC, Plaintiff
Kerkman & Dunn 839 N Jefferson St Ste 400
Milwaukee, WI 53202
Represented By
Evan Schmit
Kerkman, Wagner & Dunn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, September 05, 2019
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 09/06 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 09/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Redact
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Redact Tue 09/03 2:15 PM
Order Granting Motion to Redact Related [+] (amg, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 09/03/2019)
Related: [-] 16
18 18 misc Proposed Order Tue 09/03 9:12 AM
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Redact RE:16 - Motion to Redact filed by Attorney Evan Schmit of Kerkman & Dunn on behalf of Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC. (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 08/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Dismissing Case
court Defective Filing Notification - Proposed Orders Fri 08/30 11:19 AM
Defective Filing Notification - Action Required by the Filer: The proposed order was filed as an attachment to the motion. Orders must be docketed using the proposed order event. Please refile the proposed order using the correct event. Related [+]. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Redact filed by Plaintiff Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Thursday, August 29, 2019
16 16 motion Redact Thu 08/29 12:36 PM
Motion to Redact . Fee Amount $25 Filed by Plaintiff Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Amended (redacted) Stipulation
crditcrd none Thu 08/29 12:38 PM
Receipt of Motion to Redact 18-02253 bhl) [motion,mredact] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18611645. Fee amount 25.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 16
court Defective Filing Notification - Redaction (Creditors Only) Thu 08/29 10:24 AM
Notice to Evan Schmit : This document has been restricted from viewing and is not part of the public record because it contains identifying personal information in violation of Rule 9037(a). Unless a motion to redact this information is filed and a $25 fee is paid, this document may be stricken. Upon entry of the order, an amended document must be filed with all personal identifiers redacted. Related [+]. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
15 15 order Dismissing Case Wed 08/28 11:36 AM
Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Related [+] (amg, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 08/28/2019)
Related: [-] 13
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 08/28 11:36 AM
Disposition of Adversary 18-02253 bhl Dismissed on Stipulation (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/28 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 18-02253 bhl Closed (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
14 14 2 pgs misc Proposed Order Tue 08/27 4:09 PM
Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss RE:13 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Evan Schmit of Kerkman & Dunn on behalf of Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC. (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 08/27 4:07 PM
Stipulation By Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC and Steven Wolfington to Dismiss Filed by Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC Related [+] (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-] Chambers Docket Notice CHAP,11 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, August 22, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/23 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 08/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing (Chambers BHL) Tue 08/20 9:27 AM
Notice of Status Conference. Hearing to be held on 9/18/2019 at 10:30 AM by Telephone. (mjp, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
utility Chambers Docket Notice CHAP Mon 08/12 9:11 AM
Pre-trial hearing scheduled for 8/12/2019 has been canceled. The parties advised the Court that a resolution has been reached and will be submitted within 7 days. Related [+] (mjp)
Related: [-] 8
utility Chambers Docket Notice CHAP Mon 08/12 9:13 AM
Trial scheduled for 8/26/2019 has been canceled. The parties advised the Court that a resolution has been reached and will be submitted on or before 8/19/19. (mjp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
10 10 6 pgs answer Response (Not for Claims) Wed 06/12 2:45 PM
Response Filed by Defendant Steven Wolfington to (1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC) and Certificate of Service (Check, Richard)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 06/03 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Scheduling Order
Friday, May 31, 2019
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/31 8:23 AM
Pretrial Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Trial will be held on 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM at United States Courthouse at 517 East Wisconsin Avenue, Room 149, Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
7 7 audio Upload Audio File Wed 05/29 11:58 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 05/29/2019 10:36:28 AM ]. File Size [ 4752 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:54 ]. (Pre-trial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/29 9:18 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC Related [+] (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
5 5 audio Upload Audio File Wed 03/20 11:18 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/20/2019 10:32:46 AM ]. File Size [ 2520 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:15 ]. (Pre-trial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Adjourned Hearing Thu 03/21 1:08 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
4 4 1 pgs audio Upload Audio File Wed 02/13 11:20 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/13/2019 11:05:03 AM ]. File Size [ 1880 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:55 ]. (Pre-trial Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Adjourned Hearing Wed 02/13 5:07 PM
Preliminary Pre-trial Conference held 02/13/2019.Evan Schmidt appeared for plaintiff and Richard Check appeared for the defendant. The court continued the pre-trial conference to 03/20/2019 at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the court conference line at 1-888-808-6929, and enter access code 5457889## before the scheduled hearing time. An audio recording of the 02/13/2019 preliminary pretrial conference is available on the docket. (ele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
3 3 court Electronic Summons Issued Tue 12/11 3:46 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 1/10/2019. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 1/15/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (mjp, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/10 6:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melissa S. Hayward Filed by Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC (Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/10 6:14 PM
Adversary case 18-02253 Complaint by Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC (attorney Evan Schmit) against Steven Wolfington. Fee Amount $350 (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny),68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury),41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))(Schmit, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit D
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit E
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit F
Att: 7 1 pgs Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H