Stewart v. Cameron et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02351 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2019 1:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
James Cameron
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Ellison
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gayle Anne Hurd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lightstorm Entertainment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paramount Pictures
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skydance Media
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tencent Pictures
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Twentieth Century Fox Production
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andy Wachowski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry Wachowski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Bros.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Momar Mbergan
9309 Hilltop Ct
Laurel, MD 20708 |
|
Plaintiff
Sophia Stewart
P.O. Box 31725
Las Vegas, NV 89173 |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
50 | 50
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
49 | 49
![]() ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that24 Defendants Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that14 ,28 Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that46 Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |