Henry County, Georgia v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46310 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 1:18-cv-03899 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:58 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Specialty, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Narendra Nagareddy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John N. Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Plaintiff
Henry County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:00 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-8083480)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit -1 - Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 279 pgs Exhibit -2 - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit -3 - State Court File, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
Submission of2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation.(Knapp, Halsey) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
Submission of3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint with Brief In Support by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc..(Cole, Brenton) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Response to Complaint by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
5 | 5 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re:4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Response to Complaint . (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
Submission of5 Proposed Consent Order Granting Extension to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorneys not receiving electronic copy re [6,7,8] Orders. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting2 Plaintiff and Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, and PSS World Medical, Inc. Joint Motion to Extend the Time for the Distributor Defendants to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The period in which the Distributor Defendants must answer, object, plead, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 30 days after the later of (i) the JPML's order granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise renders a final decision denying transfer to the MDL, or (ii) this Court's ruling on remand, should any party file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
7 | 7 ORDER granting3 The Moving Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The Moving Defendants shall have up to 45 days following any decision on a motion for remand that Plaintiff may file or final decision by the JPML transferring the case to In re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804 (N.D. Ohio) to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
8 | 8 ORDER granting4 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co., CVS Health Corporation, Wal-Mart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. The Retail Pharmacy Defendants' time to move, answer, object, or otherwise to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 45 days following the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804 whichever is later. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/18. (ddm) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Narendra Nagareddy.(Cochran, Anthony) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
Submission of9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (btql) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER GRANTING9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the1 Notice of Removal with Complaint. Narendra Nagareddy's answer due 45 days after the later of the JPML's order, or this Court's ruling on remand, should any party file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/30/2018. (btql) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Mazziotti, Thomas) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
12 | 12 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Remand or Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation 2804 by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc..(Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
13 | 13 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings re:12 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Fleming, Lindsay) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
Submission of13 Proposed Consent Order to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
14 | 14 ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Stay Proceedings. All proceedings, preliminary requirements, and filing deadlines in this action under this Court's local rules, including Initial Disclosures, Early Planning Conference, and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, are STAYED until 45 days after the final determination of removal of this action to federal court or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804 (MDL 2804), whichever is later. When the stay lifts, the usual deadlines under this Courts local rules shall apply except that any event timed to the removal of an action shall instead be timed to the filing of the Retail Pharmacy Defendants' responsive pleading(s). Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/12/2018. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Daxe on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Daxe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Henry County, Georgia.(Edmond, Roderick) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Remand | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc..(Cole, Brenton) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Citation List | ||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 MOTION for Clarification re:14 Order on Motion to Stay, by Narendra Nagareddy.(Cochran, Anthony) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Response to Motion to Remand | ||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
Submission of18 MOTION for Clarification re:14 Order, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER re:18 Defendant Dr. Nagareddy's Motion for Clarification. If this case is not transferred to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. CV 17-2804 (MDL 2804), Defendants will have 45 days after that determination to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc. 16). Dr. Nagareddy is not required to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court until further order from this court. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/23/2018. (jtj) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/19/18 through 3/19/19, by Cecily J. McLeod. (McLeod, Cecily) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon Phillip Hill, IV on behalf of Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Lynn Webster (Hill, Vernon) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
Electronically Transferring Case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio as to22 MDL Conditional Certified Transfer Order. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
22 | 22 CONDITIONAL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to be transferred to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (bdb) [Transferred from gand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-03899. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |