Doe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46318 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:18-cv-03637 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:59 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
Toledo, OH 43608
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:03 PM EDT |
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. 23 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/27/18 (jwl, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN DOE. (jwl, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 110 pgs COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT, LLC, MALLINCKRODT, PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183656.), filed by JOHN DOE.(jwl, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY B. HELLER on behalf of JOHN DOE (HELLER, GREGORY) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN KENDALL on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with certificate of service(KENDALL, CAROLYN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW TODD NEWCOMER on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION with certificate of service(NEWCOMER, MATTHEW) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS KEITH ROSENBLUM on behalf of CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBLUM, DOUGLAS) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC S. RASPANTI on behalf of CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. with Certificate of Service(RASPANTI, MARC) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
7 | 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DISTRIBUTORS DEFENDANS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING 30 DAYS AFTER THE ENTRY OF A DECISION BY TEH JPML, GRANTING A MOTION TO VACATE A CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER COVERING THIS ACTION ( OR OTHERWISE FINALLY DENYING TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION TO THE MDL) TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/3/18. 10/3/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. ABERNETHY on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ORTHO- MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. with Certificate of Service(ABERNETHY, DAVID) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE MANUFACTURER DEFENDANTS, WITHOUT WAIVER OF ANY DEFENSES, SHALL HAVE THROUGH AND INCLUDING THE DATE 30 DATE AFTER THE ENTRY OF A DECISION BY THE JPML, GRANTING A MOTION TO VACATE A CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER COVERING THIS ACTION, OR OTHERWISE FINALLY DENYING TRANSFER OF THIS ACTION TO THE MDL, TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Person in charge by certified mail on 10/04/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
11 | 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Elizabeth Hawk WPS by personal on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
12 | 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Person in charge by certified mail on 09/19/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
13 | 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Barbara Scoll Sr by personal on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
14 | 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Endo Health Solutions, Inc by personal on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
15 | 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. by personal on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
16 | 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Johnson & Johnson by certified mail on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
17 | 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc by certified mail on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
18 | 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc by certified mail on 09/19/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
19 | 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Mallinckrodt LLC by certified mail on 09/21/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
20 | 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Mallinckrodt PLC by certified mail on 09/21/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
21 | 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon McKesson Corporation by certified mail on 09/19/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
22 | 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Noramco Inc by certified mail on 09/18/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
23 | 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc by certified mail on 09/19/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
24 | 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon The Purdue Frederick Company Inc by certified mail on 09/21/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
25 | 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Purdue Pharma Inc by certified mail on 09/21/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
26 | 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John K. Weston re: served Summons and Complaint upon Purdue Pharma LP by certified mail on 09/21/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
27 | 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Campbell re: served Summons and Complaint upon Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc by personal on 09/20/2018 (WESTON, JOHN) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
28 | 28 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (kp, ) [Transferred from paed on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:18-cv-03637. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |