County of San Mateo v. McKesson Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46319 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:18-cv-04535 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:59 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
County of San Mateo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2019 3:51 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-567403, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12546344). Filed by McKesson Corporation.(Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, (Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/27/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re1 Notice of Removal,4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 8/16/2018. Replies due by 8/23/2018.(Shin, Clara) Modified on 8/16/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Van Tassell ISO Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CLERK'S NOTICE directing both Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) to file Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a Magistrate Judge no later than 8/10/2018. Note: Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Shin, Clara) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
11 | 11 MDL 2804 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
Receipt from USDC-Northern Ohio. The case number is 18-op-45966. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
12 | 12 MDL ORDER 2804 ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Trott (Trott, Adam) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Marie Murphy (Murphy, Anne Marie) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
15 | 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byCounty of San Mateo.(Murphy, Anne Marie) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Anne Marie Murphy | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE by County of San Mateo Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand (Murphy, Anne Marie) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/18.(haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
19 | 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District | ||
20 | 20 REPLY filed byMcKesson Corporation.(Van Tassell, Rebecca) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Shafroth ISO Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21 Re-Notice of Motion Hearing on re7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING JPML ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 7 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
case electronically transmitted to the Northern District of Ohio. (tnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | ||
23 | 23 TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, MDL No. 2804. (tnS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
24 | 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-04535. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |