Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:Stephen L Crocker
Case #: 3:18-cv-01036
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2018
Terminated:May 01, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2019 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC
Represented By
Sally Piefer
Lindner & Marsack, S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Aeryn Barry
Represented By
Randall B. Gold
Fox & Fox, S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Deering
Represented By
Randall B. Gold
Fox & Fox, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
14 14 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/01 8:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry Wed 05/01 9:44 AM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
13 13 order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/11 10:39 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, dkt.12 , plaintiff Aeryn Barry's Title VII claims for harassment, sexual harassment or discrimination on the basis of gender are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/11/19. (jat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
12 12 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/10 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Barry's Title VII Claims for Sex Harassment (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Barry's Title VII Claims for Sex Harassment
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
11 11 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 04/03 4:03 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulated protective agreement10 is accepted and entered as the court's protective order in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/3/19. (jat)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Protective Order Wed 04/03 11:43 AM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC, (Piefer, Sally) Modified on 4/3/2019. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 21, 2019
9 9 order Pretrial Conference Order Thu 02/21 1:26 PM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 4/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due 8/15/2019. Settlement Letters due 1/10/2020. Motions in Limine due 1/24/2020. Response to Motion due 2/7/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/24/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/19. (jat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Wed 02/20 2:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2019 [:10] (cak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/13 6:51 AM
ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/12/2019. (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent - Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Consent - Defendant
Monday, February 11, 2019
7 7 misc Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report Mon 02/11 12:47 PM
Joint Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiffs Aeryn Barry, Andrew Deering (Gold, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
misc Action Requested: MJ Consent Form Mon 02/04 10:28 AM
Action Requested: If you have not already provided your[LINK:Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form] , please do so by 2/8/2019. (jat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/15 3:24 PM
ANSWER by Defendant Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Tue 01/15 3:40 PM
Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jat)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/07 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/07 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sally Piefer for Defendant Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC. (Piefer, Sally) Modified on 1/7/2019: Case number, etc. (lak)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/07 1:40 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC. Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Gold, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Fri 12/14 9:56 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Fri 12/14 9:57 AM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (jat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/13 11:47 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Randall B. Gold for Plaintiffs Aeryn Barry, Andrew Deering. (lak)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/13 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Milford Hills Hunt Club, LLC. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2375733.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gold, Randall) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/13/2018. Removed the Notice of Appearance that was attached as the first page of the Complaint.) (lak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet