Gordon et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03371 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:18-cv-01065 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 10, 2019 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
in the interest to One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Roy Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrice Adragna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nichole Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Apodaca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenda Bailey
as 8790 Hwy 560
Mountville, SC 29370 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenda (I) Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon (I) Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Bates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Belarde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Benzinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Bergen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Boykin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Brungardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Carabajal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Carabajal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Cargile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Carrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Carrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmin Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Cavesina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannah Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Coalson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandy Coalson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia Coppin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clara Costra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Costra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda (I) Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glennda Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shana Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Dill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Dill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Dill, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Skyla Dill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Drake
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Duran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Egli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Ferguson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garrett Forbes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Forbes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norman Forbes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristine Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dee Ann Francis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquis Gillen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquis (I) Gillen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orion Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Gordon
877415-071 Estill Federal Correctional Institution PO Box 699
Estill, SC 29918 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karry Homan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hoopes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joann Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joann (I) Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ya'Anna Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ute Jahnke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anglena Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catrina Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fulya Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Officer James Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maurice (I) Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yasmin Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Krakofsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla Krakofsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Logsdon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather (I) Logsdon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russel Leroy Logsdon, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Lorance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda (I) Lorance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eilene Lorance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Lorance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Lorance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Loveless
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amariz Lugo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Lugo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilma Luther
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Magginetti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christen Malone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christen (I) Malone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Maroney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Moncher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessie Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rovanna Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanra Moss-Reddick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanra (I) Moss-Reddick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tawaiian Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tawaiian (I) Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Niemetz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismael Nunez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kris Olson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Olson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Oxley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Oxley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalie Palomino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saul Palomino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saul (I) Palomino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Petersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Petersen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aiden Preussner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hunter Preussner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marquel Preussner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Preussner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Pudder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reina Pudder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Put
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Randall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roberto Rapalo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Ray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Reddick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hannah Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina (I) Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilbert Rivers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Castulo Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Americo Rosario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Rosario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Rosario
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caymen Saine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Saine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Saine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Sallee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany (I) Sallee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Santi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Sauter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheryl Schilling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Schneider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamar Sikes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Skadden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanda Skadden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Smalley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony (I) Smalley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Smalley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murray Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Spah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Stockwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tedella Stockwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tedella (I) Stockwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Strickland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary (I) Strickland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Strickland, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Strickland, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Stubbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Stubbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Sutherland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Landis Temple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Tisor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Tisor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mack Tolle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Torrans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy (I) Torrans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hiliaro Trevino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Trevino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Villarreal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy (I) Villarreal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Walker
425 Saddletrail Rd
Columbia, SC 29203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Walter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Walter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Waltman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Whittemore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marifel Whittmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Wildenstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlotte Wittie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Wittie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy Womack-Garrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Zayas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Terminated: 12/04/2018
|
|
Plaintiff
Ann Claar
Terminated: 05/17/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Claar
Terminated: 05/17/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taziah Muniz
Terminated: 05/17/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Viktoria Rivers
Terminated: 05/17/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
83 | 83
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ronnie Ferguson, Joan Forbes, Norman Forbes, Kristine Fox, Dee Ann Francis, Kathryn Gonzales, Joann (I) Jackson, Ute Jahnke, Angela Johnson, Catrina Johnson, Jamie Krakofsky, Kayla Krakofsky, Patricia Lugo, Christen (I) Malone, Barbara Maroney, Charles Moncher, Rovanna Moore, Ismael Nunez, Linda Oxley, Marquel Preussner, Reina Pudder, Rick Randall, Castulo Rodriguez, Andrea Rosario, Erica Rosario, Curtis Saine, Deanna Saine, Tammy Santi, Tedella (I) Stockwell, Mary (I) Strickland, Betty Walter, Cathy Womack-Garrett, Monysu Bisping, Dilver Brown, Harold Brown, Elisabeth Brownschiedel, Maria Bugtong, Annie Caple, Debra Conway, Jeannette Edmondson, Robert Freeman, Tiffany Harclerode, Roger Hultgren, Suzanne Hultgren, Valerie Keith Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03371-RMG, 2:18-cv-03372-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
82 | 82
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Glenda (I) Bailey, Sandra Bailey, Alexis Benzinger, Kim Boykin, Carla Cavesina, Hannah Chandler, David Coalson, Patrick Dill, Judy Douglas, Kim Adams, Felice Kay Alonzo, Leda Bartee, Alice Chambers, Kevin Cole, Joseph Mattson, Trina McKennon, Bonnie Morrison, Alfred Neal, Sharolyn Neal, Melissa Niday, Ingrid Nixon, Ruben Ortega, John Sigala, Cheryl Sims, Jennifer Whitford, Lorencio Atchley, Marilyn Bennett, Pennie Gale, Mary Niemetz, Phyllis Taylor, Nancy Valley, Scott Wilkinson, Tammy Wright, Alan Davis, Billy Long, Lonnie Rouser, Rhonda Sharkey, Daniel Cruz, Kenneth Loveless, Joseph Lucero, Ethel Montgomery, Lisa Reyes, Gabriel Trujillo, Elizabeth Vlascity, Kathleen Zajicek Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |