Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Scott D Johnson
Case #: 3:18-cv-01083
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:741 Shipping
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2018
Terminated:Apr 26, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2019 4:04 AM CDT
Claimant
Joshua Broussard
Represented By
Lee J. Amedee, III
Gauthier & Amedee, Aplc
contact info
Henry Price Mounger
Dodson, Hooks & Frederick, Aplc
contact info
Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Dodson & Hooks LLC
contact info
Andre' P. Gauthier
Gauthier & Amedee, Aplc
contact info
Counter Claimant
Joshua Broussard
Represented By
Lee J. Amedee, III
Gauthier & Amedee, Aplc
contact info
Henry Price Mounger
Dodson, Hooks & Frederick, Aplc
contact info
Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Dodson & Hooks LLC
contact info
Andre' P. Gauthier
Gauthier & Amedee, Aplc
contact info
Counter Defendant
McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc.
Represented By
Trevor M. Cutaiar
Mouledoux Brand Legrand And Brackett
contact info
Andre' J. Mouledoux
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett
contact info
Daniel J. Hoerner
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett
contact info
Plaintiff
McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc.
Represented By
Trevor M. Cutaiar
Mouledoux Brand Legrand And Brackett
contact info
Andre' J. Mouledoux
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett
contact info
Daniel J. Hoerner
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
17 17 order Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04 Tue 04/26 1:50 PM
GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (LLH)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 04/26 1:49 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal. All claims in the above captioned action be and are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/26/2022. (LLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/19 12:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joshua Broussard. (Hooks, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 03/30 3:42 PM
Notice to Counsel: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel prior to the conference. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
13 13 order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson Wed 02/19 3:45 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2020-03, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(DGM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/07 1:16 PM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed Motion to Modify Stay. The stay in this action is MODIFIED to allow Joshua Broussard to proceed to trial in the 19th JDC for the Parish of EBR. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/7/2019. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief (First) Thu 07/11 4:30 PM
MOTION TO MODIFY STAY AND ALLOW SINGLE JONES ACT CLAIM TO BE TRIED IN STATE COURT by Joshua Broussard.(ELW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Attachment
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/11 4:24 PM
ORDER granting9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to Modify Stay and Allow Single Jones Act Claim to be Tried in State Court filed by Joshua Broussard. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/11/2019. (ELW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/10 3:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to Modify Stay and Allow Single Jones Act Claim to be Tried in State Court by Joshua Broussard.(Hooks, Kenneth) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Attachment Order,
Att: 3 Attachment Motion to Modify Stay,
Att: 4 Attachment Memo in Support of Motion to Modify Stay,
Att: 5 Attachment Order to Motion to Modify Stay
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 07/09 11:09 AM
Joint STIPULATION / Offer of Judgment by Joshua Broussard. (Hooks, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Wed 07/03 2:20 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc. by Joshua Broussard.(Hooks, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/28 8:33 AM
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against All Parties, filed by McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc.(KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letters of Undertaking
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 06/26 12:59 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the4 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the First Supplemental and Amending Complaint (R. Doc. 4-2) and Letters of Undertaking (R. Doc. 4-3) into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
4 4 motion Leave to File Document Tue 06/25 9:55 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc..(Mouledoux, Andre')
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability,
Att: 3 Letters of Undertaking
utility Motion(s) Referred Tue 06/25 11:27 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:4 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 01/24 1:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc. by Joshua Broussard.(Hooks, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Verification
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
2 2 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 01/15 4:29 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (SWE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 14, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint (Complete Case Opening First) Fri 12/14 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1875495.), filed by McKinney Salvage & Heavy Lift, Inc..(Hoerner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Verification of Daniel J. Hoerner,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Kyle Smith,
Att: 4 Letter of Undertaking of International Marine,
Att: 5 Letter of Undertaking of Liberty Mutual International,
Att: 6 Notice of Action Brought for Exoneration,
Att: 7 Order Approving Security