Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-03785

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph N Callaway
Case #: 5:18-ap-00130
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2018
Terminated:Jun 16, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southco Distributing Company
Represented By
Southco Distributing Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Shareef and Afrah Hasan
Represented By
John G. Rhyne
John G. Rhyne, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/16 2:37 PM
Adversary Case 5:18-ap-130 Closed (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 05/29 1:56 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 16, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 05/17 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/16/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, May 14, 2020
16 16 order Status Conference (Set) Thu 05/14 8:55 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 5/28/2020 at 01:00 PM at Telephone Conference/Judge Callaway. . (Payne, Lisa)
Related: [-]
15 15 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Thu 05/14 8:47 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Status Conference (Payne, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
14 14 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 04/16 2:18 PM
Order Consolidating Adversary Proceedings. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
utility Note - Other (Public) Fri 10/04 8:47 AM
NOTE: Audio can be found in AP 18-00099 Related [+] (Payne, Lisa)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Status Conference
Thursday, September 19, 2019
13 13 order Status Conference (Set) Thu 09/19 3:11 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 9/25/2019 at 01:00 PM at Greenville Courtroom (New). . (Payne, Lisa)
Related: [-]
12 12 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Thu 09/19 3:09 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Status Conference (Payne, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
11 11 utility Calendar - Schedule Wed 05/22 10:45 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Schedule a Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
10 10 6 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 2:39 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Southco Distributing Company. (Saintsing, Byron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
9 9 order Extend Time Mon 04/08 12:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 5/20/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, April 04, 2019
8 8 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 04/04 11:52 AM
Third Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Southco Distributing Company Related [+]. (Saintsing, Byron)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Thursday, February 14, 2019
7 7 order Extend Time Thu 02/14 3:51 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 4/4/2019. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
6 6 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Tue 02/12 10:50 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Southco Distributing Company Related [+]. (Saintsing, Byron)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Friday, January 11, 2019
5 5 order Extend Time Fri 01/11 3:20 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 2/18/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
4 4 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Wed 01/09 9:50 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Southco Distributing Company Related [+] (Saintsing, Byron)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Thursday, December 20, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/20 1:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Southco Distributing Company 12/20/2018. filed by John G. Rhyne on behalf of Afrah Hasan ; Shareef N Hasan. (Rhyne, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
utility Set Deadline (Private) Tue 12/18 1:07 PM
Answer due by 01/16/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 17, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 12/17 1:03 PM
Summons Issued on Southco Distributing Company Answer Due 01/16/2019 (Rhyne, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/17 1:03 PM
Adversary case 18-00130 5. Complaint by Shareef and Afrah Hasan against Southco Distributing Company (Fee Not Required) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Rhyne, John)
Related: [-]
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Mon 12/17 2:09 PM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Anna Brock (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-]