Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Ocwen Financial Corporation, As Successor To PHH C
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01838 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ocwen Financial Corporation, As Successor To PHH Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ocwen Federal Bank FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., As Successor To Ocwen Federal Bank FSB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 06/13 12:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1838 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 08/16 12:36 PM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 8/16/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Tue 05/05 9:46 AM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 2:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 4:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/06 12:13 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Transcript
Fri 10/18 12:32 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 4/9/19 at 10:02 AM RE: Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/22/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/31/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/26/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/22/2019. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 05/13 5:22 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation s/h/a Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC s/h/a Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB. (Salter, Timothy) |
|
12 | 12
ans
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/13 5:21 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation s/h/a Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC s/h/a Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB.(Salter, Timothy) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/13 5:21 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation s/h/a Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC s/h/a Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB. (Salter, Timothy) |
|
10 | 10
answer
None
Mon 05/13 2:50 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp. and PHH Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB. (Salter, Timothy) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 05/06 2:27 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Binding Defendants in the New Adversary Proceedings to the Order Governing the Production of Confidential Materials in Discovery signed on 5/6/2019 (White, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Statement
Wed 04/17 1:11 PM
Statement An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Proc. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Reply
Fri 04/05 1:13 PM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion, Approve
Wed 03/20 6:09 PM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/18 12:54 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Timothy William Salter on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp. and PHH Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank, FSB. (Salter, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/13 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service of the Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C re: Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank FSB and of the Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C re: Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., as Successor to Ocwen Federal Bank FSB Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Thu 02/14 4:50 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank FSB; Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp.,as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank FSB. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Thu 02/14 10:15 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Thu 01/17 12:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Ocwen Financial Corporation, as successor to PHH Corporation and Ocwen Federal Bank FSB ; Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp.,as successor to Ocwen Federal Bank FSB . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 12/17 9:35 PM
Adversary case 18-01838 Complaint against Ocwen Financial Corporation, As Successor To PHH Corporation, Ocwen Federal Bank FSB, Ocwen Loan Servicing Corp., As Successor To Ocwen Federal Bank FSB (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |