Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:18-cv-01718
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2018
Terminated:May 23, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2019 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Police Officer Matthew Newlun
Village of Granville Police Department 141 East Broadway Street
Granville, OH 43023
Represented By
Michael John King
contact info
Defendant
Village of Granville, Ohio
141 East Broadway Street
Granville, OH 43023
Represented By
Michael John King
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant FNU Wilson
Village of Granville, Ohio Police Department 141 E. Broadway Street
Granville, OH 43023
Represented By
Michael John King
contact info
Plaintiff
Kassidy Pettit
Eric Holloway Law Group, LLC 5650 Blazer Parkway Ste 100
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
J Eric Holloway
Eric Holloway Law Group, LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 16 2020
Order - The Defendants were ORDERED to show cause why the Court should not sanction Defendants for failure to prosecute based on Defendants' failure to appear for court-ordered mediation, failure to respond to attempts to reschedule the mediation, and failure to call in for an August 26, 2020 teleconference. Default against Defendants Village of Granville, Ohio, Sergeant FNU Wilson, and Police Officer Matthew Newlun is entered. The court DENIES as MOOT ECF No. 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENIES as Moot ECF No. 28 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/16/2020. (cmw)
GPO Nov 03 2020
OPINION AND ORDER granting 35 Motion to Set Aside Default and Extend Time to File Reply to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 37 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/3/2020. (cmw)
GPO Mar 08 2021
DIRECTED to terminate ECF Nos. 16, 28, and 40. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/8/2021. (agm)ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay. Parties are ORDERED to file a joint written report on or before June 8, 2021, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. The Clerk is

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Monday, May 23, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 05/23 9:59 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (daf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
67 67 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/20 10:39 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Kassidy Pettit of Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice (Holloway, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
order Order Mon 05/16 3:40 PM
NOTATION ORDER - The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case WITHIN 30 DAYS unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Status Report due by 6/15/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/16/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]