Member Case
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-34808

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:18-bk-34826
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2018
Terminated:May 04, 2021

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Frank Theatres Montgomeryville, LLC
750 Montgomery Glen Dr
Lansdale, PA 19446-6406
Represented By
Kenneth A. Rosen
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 05/07 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
9 9 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/04 3:55 PM
Order: (I) Authorizing The Destruction And Abandonment Of Records; (II) Entering A Final Decree Closing The Chapter 11 Cases; And (III) Terminating The Responsibilities Of The Claims Agent. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice., Granting Motion For Final Decree. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/4/2021. (rah)
Related: [-] 1102 1102
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 05/04 3:58 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
8 8 claims Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (To Be Used With One Case Only) Mon 06/15 2:35 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Claim Number 1. (Okafor, De Vere)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2019
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 01/10 11:41 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at Suite 1401, One Newark Center. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 23, 2018
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 12/24 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
5 5 order Joint Administration Fri 12/21 2:43 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 18-34808 Member Cases: 18-34826 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/21/2018. (env)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Fri 12/21 1:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
3 3 motion Joint Administration Wed 12/19 6:52 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 18-34808 18-34812 18-34818 18-34820 18-34822 18-34823 18-34824 18-34825 18-34826 18-34828 18-34816 18-34830 18-34832 18-34833 18-34837 18-34839 18-34840 18-34841 18-34844 18-34845 18-34846 18-34847 18-34848 18-34849 Filed by Kenneth A. Rosen on behalf of Frank Theatres Montgomeryville, LLC. (Rosen, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 utility Case Assigned Wed 12/19 4:51 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Stacey Meisel added to the case. (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 12/19 4:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Kenneth A. Rosen on behalf of Frank Theatres Montgomeryville, LLC. List of all creditors due 01/2/2019. Schedule(s) due 01/2/2019.Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals due 01/2/2019.Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities for Non Individuals due 01/2/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 01/2/2019. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 04/18/2019. (Rosen, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 12/19 6:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 18-34826 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A37841646, fee amount $ 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1