Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:18-cv-05792
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2018
Terminated:Jan 23, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2019 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Santana Bellard
and all others 2727 Godby Rd E-6
College Park, GA 30349
Plaintiff
Contour Sierra LLC Sierra Townhomes
2727 Godby Rd
College Park, GA 30349


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
7 7 misc Mail Returned Wed 02/20 10:30 AM
Mail sent to Contour Sierra LLC Sierra Townhomes re5 Order Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Insufficient Address. Unable to Forward. (rjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
6 6 utility Remark Wed 01/23 3:36 PM
Case electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (rjs)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Wed 01/23 3:27 PM
ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This civil action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/23/2019. (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 01/23 1:33 PM
Submission of3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/23 3:28 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Santana Bellard and Contour Sierra LLC Sierra Townhomes re5 Order. (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/23 3:30 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 31, 2018
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 12/31 2:55 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/31/2018. (rjs)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 12/31 2:53 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/31/2018. (rjs)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 12/31 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Santana Bellard.(rjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 12/31 2:55 PM
ORDER (found in the3 R&R) granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/31/2018. (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/31 2:56 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Santana Bellard, Contour Sierra LLC Sierra Townhomes re Order on IFP,3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/20 11:05 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/20 11:04 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Santana Bellard.(cmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet