Mullane v. The United States of America,et.al.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Referred: | Judith G Dein |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-12618 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2019 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Breaking Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elie Mystal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alison W. Lehr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Mullane
60 Clyde Street Unit # 1
Somerville, MA 02145 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Federico A. Moreno
Terminated: 01/03/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
194 | 194
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 04/21 6:37 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to169 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Mullane,189 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Mullane,175 Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Mullane,170 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jonathan Mullane. Appeal189 ,170 ,175 ,169 Terminated (Paine, Matthew) |