Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:18-cr-01666
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2018
Last checked: Friday Dec 21, 2018 12:35 AM MST
Defendant
Kevin Lee Kerns (1)
Represented By
Stephen Santos Garcia
Garcia Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin Christopher Oshana
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2018 12:56 AM MST
Saturday, December 01, 2018
Arrest of Kevin Lee Kerns on 12/1/2018. (ESL) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 03, 2018
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kevin Lee Kerns. (ESL) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by USA as to Kevin Lee Kerns signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 12/03/2018. (ESL) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Initial Appearance as to Kevin Lee Kerns held at 3:29 PM. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. CJA Attorney Stephen Santos Garcia appointed as counsel for the defendant. Upon request of defense counsel, IT IS ORDERED setting a Status Hearing re: Detention Hearing, Preliminary Hearing, and Material Witness Video Deposition. Defendant temporarily detained pending further proceedings. Initial Appearance as to the material witness held at 3:32 PM. The material witness states his TRUE NAME to be FRANK HONORIO VELAZQUEZ-VELAZQUEZ. The record shall so reflect. MATERIAL WITNESS SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. AFPD Zachary Cain appointed as counsel for the material witness. The Court advises the material witness of the nature of the proceedings and that he will remain temporarily detained until his deposition can be taken by videotape, if the parties deem necessary. The Court further advises the material witness that a Status Hearing regarding this issue has been set for 12/11/2018. Counsel for the material witness waives the presence of his client at the Status Hearing. SPANISH interpreter required for the material witness ONLY. Appearances : AUSA William Bryan on behalf of Justin Oshana for the Government, CJA Attorney Stephen Santos Garcia for the defendant, and AFPD Zachary Cain for the material witness. The defendant is present and in custody for the portion of the proceedings held 3:29 PM to 3:32 PM; the material witness is present and in custody for the portion of the proceedings held 3:32 PM to 3:37 PM. SPANISH Interpreter Renata Yawn assists the material witness ONLY. Status Hearing re: Detention Hearing, Preliminary Hearing, and Material Witness Video Deposition set for 12/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Bridget S. Bade. Related [+] Hearing held 3:29 PM to 3:32 PM as to the defendant, and 3:33 PM to 3:37 PM as to the material witness. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kevin Lee Kerns. (MRH) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
5 5 MATERIAL WITNESS ORDER as to Kevin Lee Kerns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 12/3/2018. (MRH) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
7 7 STIPULATION and JOINT MOTION for Release of Material Witnesses by USA, Kevin Lee Kerns as to Kevin Lee Kerns. (KGM) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade: Status Hearing re: Detention Hearing, Preliminary Hearing, and Video Depositions as to Kevin Lee Kerns held on 12/11/2018. Preliminary Hearing waived. Defendant held to answer before District Court. IT IS ORDERED granting7 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witnesses. The United States Marshal is directed to release material witness Frank Honocio Velazquez-Velazquez to the Department of Homeland Security for return to his country of origin. Zachary Cain is relieved as counsel for material witness. Detention Hearing requested. Appearances : AUSA Justin Oshana for the Government, CJA Attorney Stephen S. Garcia for defendant, and AFPD Zachary Cain for material witness (presence waived). Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 12/18/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. Related [+] Hearing held 11:05 AM to 11:08 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
9 9 ORDER pursuant to7 Stipulation as to Kevin Lee Kerns: Directing the United States Marshal to release the material witness in this action, Frank Honocio Velazquez-Velazquez, to the Department of Homeland Security for return to his country of origin. Material Witness terminated, Attorney Zachary D Cain terminated in case as to material witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 12/11/2018.(KGM) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Detention Hearing as to Kevin Lee Kerns held on 12/18/2018. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk and a danger. Appearances : AUSA Justin Oshana for the Government, CJA Attorney Stephen Garcia for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 11:28 AM to 11:42 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kevin Lee Kerns. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 12/18/2018.(KGM) [2:18-mj-09484-ESW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
12 12 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Kevin Lee Kerns (1) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 12/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. (REK)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
14 14 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Kevin Lee Kerns.(SLQ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary