Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Guild Mortgage Company individually and as success
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01866 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.
contact info |
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 03/22 1:27 PM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 3/22/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/22 1:28 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1866 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Mon 05/04 11:17 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Transcript
Mon 03/09 4:37 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 1:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Fri 09/06 9:45 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Opposition
Fri 07/12 3:25 PM
Opposition Plaintiff Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Pro Forma Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer, Involuntary Petition
Mon 05/13 8:01 PM
Answer, Involuntary Petition Answer to Adversary Complaint filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/13 7:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Pro-Forma Motion to Dismiss filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/08 7:15 PM
Certificate of Service of the Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-C Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Reply
Sun 04/07 8:49 AM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/21 12:22 PM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Fri 03/15 1:06 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as theCentral Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
ans
Statement
Thu 03/14 4:50 PM
Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-4 of the Amended Case Management Order | ||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 7:35 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Tue 01/29 4:08 PM
Affidavit Regarding Issuance of Summons Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/24 7:52 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Demand for Jury Trial filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/22 3:23 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Appearance of Counsel filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/22 3:10 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Association of Counsel filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
Monday, January 21, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/21 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Notice of Change of Address filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/16 6:23 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by G. Ehrich Lenz on behalf of Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc.. (Lenz, G.) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 12/21 5:45 AM
Adversary case 18-01866 Complaint against Guild Mortgage Company individually and as successor in interest to Liberty Financial Group, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |