Simon J. Burchett, Inc. v. Containers Direct, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-12134 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Containers Direct, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
A.P. Moller Maersk A/S
Terminated: 04/03/2019
|
|
Plaintiff
Simon J. Burchett, Inc.
Terminated: 01/29/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/21 1:12 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. USCA Case Number 19-0593 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/21/2019. (nd) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 05/01 9:29 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Zoe Phillips dated May 1, 2019 re: response to the April 30, 2019 letter from Plaintiff's counsel ECF No. 18. Document filed by A.P. Moller Maersk A/S.(Phillips, Zoe) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 04/03 2:53 PM
ORDER. The Court hereby grants the motion for reconsideration in the following respect: whereas the case was previously dismissed with prejudice, the case is now dismissed without prejudice as to defendant A.P. Moller Maersk A/S. The Clerk is directed to close the entry at docket number 20. SO ORDERED. Granting20 Motion for Reconsideration. Party A.P. Moller Maersk A/S terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/29/2019) (rjm) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/28 8:14 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appeal re:20 MOTION for Reconsideration re;19 Order .. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc..(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Donation | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/21 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Containers Direct, LLC. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 03/21 3:45 PM
DECLARATION of Richard Garbarini in Support re:20 MOTION for Reconsideration re;19 Order .. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc..(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlment Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Email, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Email | ||
21 | 21
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 03/21 3:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION for Reconsideration re;19 Order . . Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Reconsideration
Thu 03/21 3:30 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re;19 Order . Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc..(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/11 5:32 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby reaffirms its dismissal of the case with prejudice, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/11/2019) (jca) |
|
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 03/11 9:55 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:18 Notice of Appeal,. (nd) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Mon 03/11 9:57 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) |
||
Sunday, March 10, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Sun 03/10 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from16 Order of Dismissal,,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16470510. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Mon 02/11 11:52 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 2/11/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jwh) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 02/11 11:44 AM
ORDER: This case was scheduled for an initial pretrial conference on February 7, 2019 at 11:00 AM. No one appeared on behalf of any of the parties. The Court, thinking that there may have been a misunderstanding, repeatedly called and emailed plaintiff's counsel, who did not respond. Accordingly, it appears to the Court that plaintiff has abandoned the case. The case is hereby dismissed without prejudice to being reinstated if plaintiff's counsel provides the Court, within three (3) business days of the signing of this Order, with a sworn affidavit indicating why he has not appeared or responded to the Court's communications. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2019) (jwh) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 01/29 12:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: A.P. Moller Maersk A/S. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 01/29 12:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/28 5:12 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A/P Moller Maersk A/S, re:14 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 01/28 5:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against A/P Moller Maersk A/S, Containers Direct, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Related document:1 Complaint,.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Registration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Containers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Maersk, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit License, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Social Media | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 01/28 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/28/2019) (jwh) |
|
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/28 7:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A/P Moller Maersk A/S, re:11 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 01/28 11:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 11 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 01/28 11:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
Saturday, January 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Sat 01/26 7:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Containers Direct, LLC, A/P Moller Maersk A/S with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc., A/P Moller Maersk A/S. Related document:1 Complaint,.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Registration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Containers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Maersk, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit License, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Social Media | ||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/25 5:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Containers Direct, LLC served on 1/16/2018, answer due 2/6/2018. Service was accepted by Brian D. O'Connere. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/02 4:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Containers Direct, LLC. (pc) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 12/28 2:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/28 2:28 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Containers Direct, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Wed 12/26 10:48 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 12/26 10:38 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 12/26 10:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 12/26 10:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 12/26 10:42 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Signature Omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 12/26 10:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard M Garbarini to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Attorney information omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) |
||
Sunday, December 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Sun 12/23 9:50 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 12/23 9:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 12/23 7:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/21 8:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Containers Direct, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/21 8:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Containers Direct, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16100368)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett, Inc..(Garbarini, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Registration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Assignment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit SunBiz Records |