Andrew Addeo v. Philadelphia Firefighter, et al
Original Case: 2:17-cv-02239
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-03783 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
PHILADELPHIA FIREFIGHTER AND PARAMEDIC UNION LOCAL 22 OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREW ADDEO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Andrew Addeo in District Court No. 2-17-cv-02239. (ARR) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs DC_Memorandum_112118 | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs DC_Order_112118 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |