CODREA et al v. WHITAKER et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Dabney L Friedrich |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-03086 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 25, 2019 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW WHITAKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID CODREA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SCOTT HEUMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OWEN MONROE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 03/05 1:11 PM
USCA Case Number 21-1707 for52 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by SCOTT HEUMAN, OWEN MONROE, DAVID CODREA. (eg) |
||
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
53 | 53
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit
Wed 02/24 3:44 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit. The appeal fee was paid this date re52 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,. (eg) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
52 | 52
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit
Tue 02/23 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to51 Memorandum & Opinion,50 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by DAVID CODREA, SCOTT HEUMAN, OWEN MONROE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-8232177. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) |