Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-51888

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:18-ap-02156
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2018
Terminated:Jan 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Commodore Bank
PO Box 400
Tiffin, OH 44883
Represented By
Commodore Bank
contact info
Defendant
James N. Bahnsen
Treasurer, Fairfield County, Ohio 210 E Main St #206
Lancaster, OH 43130
Represented By
James N. Bahnsen
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas E Gill
5285 Fairfield Beach Road
Thornville, OH 43076
Represented By
Laura M Nesbitt
The Nesbitt Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikole L Gill
5285 Fairfield Beach Road
Thornville, OH 43076
Represented By
Laura M Nesbitt
The Nesbitt Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/03 10:46 AM
Adversary Case 2:18-ap-2156 Closed (2kst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
17 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 10/10 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)16 Order (Generic)
Friday, October 04, 2019
16 16 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 10/07 3:55 PM
Agreed Order Resolving Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (2sd)
Related: [-] 12 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Gill, Plaintiff Nikole L Gill
Thursday, September 19, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 09/19 3:50 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel terminating Christopher Charles Camboni, Filed by Defendant Commodore Bank. (Stephan, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
court Hearing Canceled Fri 08/16 11:32 AM
Proceeding Memo: 8/16/2019 - Follow-up telephonic status conference not held. Parties reported matter resolved. Agreed order to be submitted with 14 days. (2kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 08/13 11:28 AM
Proceeding Memo: 8/13/2019 - Follow-up telephonic status conference held. Follow-up telephonic status conference scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on August 16, 2019. Chapter 13 trustee to participate. Appearances: Laura Nesbitt for the Plaintiff; Christopher Camboni for the Defendant. (blg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/12 3:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Commodore Bank. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
13 13 misc Amended Document Tue 07/30 12:04 PM
Joint Amended Document Filed by Defendant Commodore Bank Related [+]. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B to Amended Joint Stipulation of Facts
Monday, July 29, 2019
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/29 6:00 PM
Amended Complaint by Laura M Nesbitt on behalf of Nikole L Gill, Thomas E Gill against James N. Bahnsen, Commodore Bank. (Nesbitt, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 07/23 2:52 PM
Proceeding Memo: 7/23/2019 - Follow-up telephonic status conference held. Plaintiff to file amended complaint and the parties to file amended stipulations as soon as possible. Parties will continue working to resolve the matter consensually with the involvement of the Chapter 13 trustee and will file a motion to compromise if the matter is resolved. Final follow-up telephonic status conference scheduled for 9:45 a.m. on August 13, 2019. If the matter is not resolved by that date, then a briefing schedule will be set. Appearances: Laura Nesbitt for the Plaintiff; Christopher Camboni for the Defendant. (blg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 07/16 3:56 PM
Stipulation with Commodore Bank, Thomas E. Gill, and Nikole L. Gill as to underlying facts of the adversary proceeding Filed by Defendant Commodore Bank. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 07/02 11:28 AM
Proceeding Memo: 7/2/2019 - Follow-up telephonic status conference held. Ms. Nesbitt to upload agreed order providing that the deadline for the parties to file stipulations is July 16, 2019. Parties also will continue working to resolve the matter consensually. Follow-up telephonic status conference scheduled for July 23, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Appearances: Laura Nesbitt for the Plaintiff; Christopher Camboni for the Defendant. (blg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 06/24 10:54 AM
Proceeding Memo: 6/19/2019 - Follow-up telephonic status conference held. Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's settlement offer by July 28, 2019. Follow-up telephonic status conference scheduled for July 2, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Appearances: Laura Nesbitt for the Plaintiff; Christopher Camboni for the Defendant. (blg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 05/14 11:20 AM
Proceeding Memo: 5/8/2019 - Pretrial held. Plaintiff to make written settlement offer to Defendant Commodore Bank. Follow-up telephonic status conference scheduled for June 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Appearances: Laura Nesbitt for the Plaintiff; Christopher Camboni for Defendant Commodore Bank. (blg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
10 10 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 05/01 11:27 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendant Commodore Bank Related [+]. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, March 28, 2019
9 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 03/29 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)8 Scheduling Order
Monday, March 25, 2019
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/26 2:13 PM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/1/2019.Pretrial set for 5/8/2019 at 10:45 AM Columbus Conference Room 4th Floor for1 , (2sd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas E Gill, Plaintiff Nikole L Gill
Monday, January 28, 2019
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 01/28 10:31 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed.Corporate parents added to case Commodore Financial Network, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Commodore Bank. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/28 10:24 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Commodore Bank. (Camboni, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/03 7:05 PM
Certificate of Service Summons and Complaint on James N. Bahnsen, Treasurer, Fairfield County, Ohio Filed by Plaintiffs Nikole L Gill, Thomas E Gill Related [+]. (Nesbitt, Laura) Modified on 1/4/2019 (2sd)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/03 7:04 PM
Certificate of Service Summons and Complaint on Commodore Bank Filed by Plaintiffs Nikole L Gill, Thomas E Gill Related [+]. (Nesbitt, Laura) Modified on 1/4/2019 (2sd)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, December 28, 2018
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 12/28 11:49 AM
Summons Issued on James N. Bahnsen Date Issued 12/28/2018, Answer Due 01/28/2019 (Nesbitt, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Issued Fri 12/28 11:48 AM
Summons Issued on Commodore Bank Date Issued 12/28/2018, Answer Due 01/28/2019 (Nesbitt, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/28 11:23 AM
Adversary case 2:18-ap-02156. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Thomas E Gill, Nikole L Gill against Commodore Bank, James N. Bahnsen. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Nesbitt, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deed
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage
Att: 3 Exhibit Note