City of Huntington Indiana v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46357 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Northern, 1:18-cv-00399 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:02 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Huntington Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:43 PM EDT |
Saturday, December 01, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3747555.), filed by City of Huntington, Indiana.(Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chou-il Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Herceg, Manuel) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | ||
4 | 4 Attorney submitted no summons with complaint. (lhc) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Uncertified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-71), transferring case to MDL-2804 in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/20/2018. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-71) transferring case to Multi-District Litigation (MDL-2804) in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 12/20/18. (jld) [Transferred from innd on 12/27/2018.] | |
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-00399. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |