Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:18-op-46361
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2018
Case in other court:California Northern, 1:18-cv-07430
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:02 PM EST
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan Sackler
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
Thrifty Payless Inc.
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Walgreens Co.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Health Mart Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Mark H. Lynch
Covington & Burling - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Plaintiff
Hoopa Valley Tribe
Represented By
Paulina do Amaral
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein
contact info
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein - San Francisco
contact info

GPO Dec 27 2018
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]

Docket last updated: 10/23/2019 2:50 PM EDT
Monday, December 10, 2018
1 1 207 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12915816.). Filed byThe Hoopa Valley Tribe.(Cabraser, Elizabeth) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Hoopa Valley Tribe.. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
Remark: Case File Electronically Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio. (msrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 12/27/2018.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-07430. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]