Union County, Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-46284 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 2:18-cv-00203 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:03 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J. M. Smith Corp
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Union County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:18 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 398 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Union County, Georgia. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8230964)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 11/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 11/30/2018.] | |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-68 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transferred to the USDC Northern District of Ohio. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 11/30/2018.] | |
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 2:18-cv-00203. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |